California Tow Truck Association v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: California Tow Truck Association
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2010cv03184
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING CTTA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN PART by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
March 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 45 Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment. Reset Hearing as to 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 45 Cross MOTION for Summa ry Judgment AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing reset for 2/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/5/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED ORDER re 38 Order resetting hearing. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference reset for 10/26/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/7/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to continue CMC re 6 Stipulation filed by City and County of San Francisco Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/01/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Tow Truck Association v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Tow Truck Association
Represented By: Brooks Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Vince Chhabria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?