Flagstar Bank, FSB v. The Loan Experts Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Defendant: The Loan Experts Corporation, Hormoz Nazari, Elizabeth Padilla, 1350 Escondido Coastal, LLC, Westlake Coastal, LLC, Allstar Appraisals, Inc., James May and Stewart Title of California
Case Number: 3:2010cv03190
Filed: July 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 224 Motion to Alter Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 215 Motion for Leave to File. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 166 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER RE: JOHNSON DECLARATION EXHIBITS L, M, N AND O. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/19/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RE: OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/10/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting re 165 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 79-5(d) filed by Stewart Title of California. (Memorandum of points and authorities). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/30/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER regarding response to administrative motion to seal documents re 165 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stewart Title of California. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/23/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER to set pretrial conference and case deadlines re 162 Stipulation filed by Hormoz Nazari, Stewart Title of California, The Loan Experts Corporation Expert Discovery due by 9/6/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 8/23/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/29/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re 159 Stipulation filed by Hormoz Nazari, Stewart Title of California, The Loan Experts Corporation Bench Trial re-set to 10/15/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/11/12. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re 156 Letter Brief filed by Hormoz Nazari, Stewart Title of California, The Loan Experts Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/3/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 154 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Discovery Letter.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 149 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Joint letter due 3/16/12.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER for substitution of counsel, Attorney Mark B. Fredkin for The Loan Experts Corporation,Mark B. Fredkin for The Loan Experts Corporation added. Attorney Elizabeth Catherine Gianola terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/6/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER of dismissal of certain claims (Count Vi & VII) againts the LOAN EXPERTS CORP. d/ba/a ALL AMERICAN FINANCE re 110 Stipulation filed by Flagstar Bank, FSB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/11/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER to appear telephonically at CMC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER to schedule ICMC re 104 Stipulation filed by Flagstar Bank, FSB Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/17/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER for extension to time for exchange of initial disclosures. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re defendant to appear telephonically at CMC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/14/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER re substitution of counsel re 60 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Stewart Title of California, Attorney Candie Y Chang and Robert Gerald Garrett terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/15/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER substitution of counsel re 53 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by The Loan Experts Corporation, Attorney Vincent C. Rabaut and Madeleine R. Szymanski terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/1/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR OPPOSITION AND SETTING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Laporte on 8/9/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flagstar Bank, FSB v. The Loan Experts Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagstar Bank, FSB
Represented By: Richard E. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Loan Experts Corporation
Represented By: Vincent C. Rabaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormoz Nazari
Represented By: Vincent C. Rabaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Padilla
Represented By: Vincent C. Rabaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1350 Escondido Coastal, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Zawideh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Coastal, LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Zawideh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstar Appraisals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title of California
Represented By: Richard A. Sundquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?