Jardine v. Maryland Casualty Company
Plaintiff: James Jardine
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv03318
Filed: July 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/5/2011. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (35) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (36) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:10-cv-03318-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Third Cause of Action for Statutory Violation of Unfair Insurance Practices Act in C-10-3335-SC and C-10-3336-SC. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/13/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying stipulation to continue trial. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/27/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER Substituting Employers Fire Insurance Company for One Beacon Insurance Company in C-10-3335-SC and C-10-3336-SC (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES Discovery due by 11/23/2011. Jury Selection set for 1/23/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/9/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating cases C-10-3318-SC, C-10-3319-SC, C-10-3335-SC and C-10-3336-SC for pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/19/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jardine v. Maryland Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jardine
Represented By: Ronald George Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?