IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Foster et al
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund, IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund, Electrical Contractors Trust, Contractors Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Electrical Industry Service Corporation, Victor Uno and Don Campbell
Defendant: Barry Foster and Barry Foster Electrical Contractor
Case Number: 3:2010cv03407
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE Judgment Debtor Exam set for 2/5/2014 34 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/3/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION 29 ; SETTING Judgment Debtor Exam for 2/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/16/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING re 11 Notice of Intent to Move for Default Judgment and Rquest to Vacate Case Management Conference filed by Contractors Administration Fund, IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund, Electrical Contractors Trust, IBEW Local 595 Hea lth & Welfare Trust Fund, Victor Uno, IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund, Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Electrical Industry Service Corporation, IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund, Don Campbell. Case management conference set for 11/12/10 at 1:30 PM has been vacated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/3/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Contractors Trust
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contractors Administration Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor Management Cooperation Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Industry Service Corporation
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Uno
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Campbell
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Foster Electrical Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?