State of Missouri et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: State of Missouri, State of Arkansas, State of Michigan, State of West Virginia and State of Wisconsin
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Chimei Innolux Corp., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Japan Co Ltd, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Displays Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices USA, Inc., LG Display Co. Ltd., LG Display America Inc., Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Semiconductor Inc., Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation
Case Number: 3:2010cv03619
Filed: August 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 FINAL JUDGMENT RE INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF/STATE ENTITY CLASS ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/1/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (5419) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned DAPs, AGs, and LG Display, by and through their undersigned liaison counsel and subject to the concurrence of the Court, as follows:(1) The time for the undersigned DAPs and AGs served with LG Displays Motion to Amend to file their Oppositions to LG Displays Motion shall be extended to and including April 27, 2012. The DAPs shall file a single opposition brief to LG Displays Motion to Amend.(2) LG Displays time to file its Reply(ies) in support of its Motion shall be extended to and including May 8, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER approving revised form of notice and resetting hearing.. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/2/12. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER extending time for discovery Re: Wisconsin (filed in 10-3619 only) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting exentsion re: discovery w/Judge's signature (#4488) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE: PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER extending time for Discovery (Re: Wisconsin) #4253 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE: STIPULATION and [proposed] Order Extending Time to Respond to Amended Complaint (State of Missouri, et al.) by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Order Extending Time to Respond to (State of Missouri, et al.) Amended Complaint by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Lutz, Lindsay)(COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO INCLUDE THE CAPTION OF EACH CASE A DOCUMENT APPLIES TO)(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Missouri et al v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Andrew M. Hartnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Arkansas
Represented By: David A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Michigan
Represented By: M Elizabeth Lippitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Jill L. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Gwendolyn J. Cooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chimei Innolux Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Japan Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannstar Display Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?