Edwards et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Beatrice Edwards and Carl Edwards
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Grace Fritts, Mercury Insurance Group and Kaiser Permanente
Case Number: 3:2010cv03755
Filed: August 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer granting 150 Defendant MetLife's Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/19/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/12/2013. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CORRECTION OF TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/22/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re 141 Request filed by Carl Edwards, Beatrice Edwards Motions due by 4/19/2013. Motion(s) Hearing reset for 6/14/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2013)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 135 Motion for Default Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER RE-OPENING CASE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/17/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/20/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/27/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/9/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re MERCURY CASUALTY COMPANY, Mercury Insurance Group terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/8/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 58 Motion for Leave to File. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 27 Motion to Dismiss; granting 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Compel Arbitration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/23/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/8/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatrice Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Fritts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?