Terreri v. FTI Consulting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erik Terreri
Defendant: FTI Consulting, Inc., UNUM Life Insurance Company of America and Unum Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03867
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 Stipulation of Dismissal of Action with Prejudice; [proposed] Order - filed by FTI Consulting, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING APPEARANCE BY PHONE re 33 Letter filed by Unum Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 20 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, FTI Consulting, Inc., Unum Group, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 18 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group, Inc. Case Management Conference set for 3/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/16/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 7 Stipulation filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terreri v. FTI Consulting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Terreri
Represented By: Lee S. Harris, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTI Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?