Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC v. Zoomba LDC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Defendant: Zoomba LDC and WWW.SHOPPSJAILBREAK.COM
Case Number: 3:2010cv03909
Filed: August 31, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2010 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 61 Summons Returned Executed (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Arthur Bates, II served on 10/12/2010, answer due 11/2/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Alex Esquivel served on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Service waived by Fai King Fong waiver sent on 10/15/2010, answer due 12/14/2010. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 20, 2010 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Tom Nooker served on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 14, 2010 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Bin Le Zhong served on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Thahn Nguygen served on 10/6/2010, answer due 10/27/2010. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 49 Preliminary Injunction (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 54 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT FAI KING FONG, individually and on behalf of www.ps3breakonline.com, re doc 46 , 47 . Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/12/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010) .
October 14, 2010 53 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT ALEX ESQUIVEL, individually and on behalf of NDSGAMER, re doc 44 . Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/12/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 52 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT BIN LE ZHONG, individually and on behalf of www.ps3breakonline.com, re doc 41 . Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/12/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 51 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT TOM NOOKER, individually and on behalf of www.buyps3jailbreak.webs.com, re 37 Stipulation filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/12/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 14, 2010 50 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 28 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal: (1) Declaration of John Hu in support of ex parte motion for temporary restraining order and order to show cause re preliminary injunction; (2) Exhibit D to Declaration of Jennifer J. Liu; (3) Exhibits 1-2,P,Q and S to Declaration of Ryan Bricker. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 13, 2010 49 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 12, 2010 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 45 Notice (Other), 47 Notice (Other), 44 Stipulation, 46 Stipulation (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 47 NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC OF STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENTERED INTO BY DEFENDANT FAI KING FONG AND ON BEHALF OF WWW.PS3BREAKONLINE.COM (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 46 STIPULATION OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT FAI KING FONG, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF WWW.PS3BREAKONLINE.COM; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 45 NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC OF STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENTERED INTO BY DEFENDANT ALEX ESQUIVEL AND ON BEHALF OF NDSGAMER (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 44 STIPULATION OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT ALEX ESQUIVEL, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF NDSGAMER; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 43 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing. Counsel for Plaintiff(s): Timothy Cahn, Ryan Bricker, Holly Gaudreau. Counsel for Defendant(s):No appearances by defendantsor representative for defendants that did not respond to the order to show cause; the court submitted the matter; the court to issue order. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2010)
October 8, 2010 42 NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC OF STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENTERED INTO BY DEFENDANT BIN LE ZHONG AKA BEN LEE AND ON BEHALF OF WW.PS3BREAKONLlNE.COM (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 41 STIPULATION RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT BIN LE ZHONG, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF WW.PS3BREAKONLlNE.COM; PROPOSED ORDER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 39 Declaration in Support, (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 39 Declaration of RYAN BRICKER [SUPPLEMENTAL] IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 7, 2010 38 NOTICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC OF STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ENTERED INTO BY DEFENDANT TOM NOOKER, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF WWW.BUYPS3JAILBREAK.WEBS.COM (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 7, 2010 37 STIPULATION RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANT TOM NOOKER, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF WWW.BUYPS3JAILBREAK.WEBS.COM; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/7/2010)
October 6, 2010 36 Received Document: SECURITY $5,000, Receipt Number 34611051420 by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 6, 2010 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 5, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/12/2010 10:00 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 33 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 24 Ex Parte Application. The parties shall appear before Judge Walker for a hearing on the order to show cause on October 12, 2010 at 10 AM. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 4, 2010 34 Summons Issued as to Arthur Bates, II, Alex Esquivel, Fai King Fong, Vlad Gazoune, Bin Le Zhong, Huanran Lee, Thahn Nguygen, Tom Nooker, WWW.SHOPPSJAILBREAK.COM, Zoomba LDC. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 2, 2010 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 29 Declaration in Support, 24 Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT, 30 Proposed Order, 31 Declaration in Support,,, 26 Declaration in Support, 25 Declaration in Support, 27 Proposed Order, 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTION OF DECLARATION OF JOHN HU AND EXHIBIT A; EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF JENNIFER Y. LIU; AND EXHIBITS I-2, P, Q, AND S TO DECLARATION OF RYAN BRICKER (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/2/2010)
October 2, 2010 31 Declaration of Ryan Bricker in Support of 24 Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I-1, # 10 Exhibit I-2 [SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL], # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P [SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL], # 18 Exhibit Q [SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL], # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S [SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL], # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/2/2010)
October 2, 2010 30 Proposed Order re 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTION OF DECLARATION OF JOHN HU AND EXHIBIT A; EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF JENNIFER Y. LIU; AND EXHIBITS I-2, P, Q, AND S TO DECLARATION OF RYAN BRICKER by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/2/2010)
October 2, 2010 29 Declaration of Holly Gaudreau in Support of 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTION OF DECLARATION OF JOHN HU AND EXHIBIT A; EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF JENNIFER Y. LIU; AND EXHIBITS I-2, P, Q, AND S TO DECLARATION OF RYAN BRICKER filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/2/2010)
October 2, 2010 28 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTION OF DECLARATION OF JOHN HU AND EXHIBIT A; EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF JENNIFER Y. LIU; AND EXHIBITS I-2, P, Q, AND S TO DECLARATION OF RYAN BRICKER filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/2/2010)
October 2, 2010 27 Proposed Order re 24 Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/2/2010)
October 1, 2010 26 Declaration of Jennifer Y. Liu in Support of 24 Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT [EXHIBIT D SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C contiuation through Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 25 Declaration of John Hu in Support of 24 Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT [REDACTED] filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 24 Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND ORDER OF IMPOUNDMENT filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
October 1, 2010 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against WWW.SHOPPSJAILBREAK.COM, Zoomba LDC. Filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 9, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker finding as moot doc 6 Motion to Shorten Time; GRANTING doc 10 Motion to Expedite Discovery. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 8, 2010 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 10 MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 6 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY (Gaudreau, Holly) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 19 EXHIBITS re 11 Declaration in Support MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 18 EXHIBITS re 11 Declaration in Support MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 7, 2010 17 EXHIBITS re 11 Declaration in Support MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 16 EXHIBITS re 11 Declaration in Support MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 15 EXHIBITS re 11 Declaration in Support MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 14 EXHIBITS re 11 Declaration in Support MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 11 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 11 Declaration in Support, 10 MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY, 12 Proposed Order (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 12 Proposed Order re 10 MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 11 Declaration of TIMOTHY R. CAHN in Support of 10 MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Related document(s) 10 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 10 MOTION to Expedite DISCOVERY filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC re 6 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, 8 Proposed Order, 7 Declaration in Support,,,, (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 8 Proposed Order re 6 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 7 Declaration of TIMOTHY R. CAHN in Support of 6 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY R. CAHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, # 2 Exhibit B TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY R. CAHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, # 3 Exhibit C TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY R. CAHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, # 4 Exhibit D TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY R. CAHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, # 5 Exhibit E - PART 1 OF 2 TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY R. CAHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, # 6 Exhibit E - PART 2 OF 2 TO DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY R. CAHN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY)(Related document(s) 6 ) (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 6 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY filed by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (Cahn, Timothy) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 31, 2010 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding: COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 4 Summons Issued as to WWW.SHOPPSJAILBREAK.COM, Zoomba LDC. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 31, 2010 3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC identifying Other Affiliate Sony Computer Entertainment Inc.,, Other Affiliate Sony Corporation of America, Other Affiliate Sony Computer Entertainment Europe Ltd., Other Affiliate Sony Corporation of Japan for Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010) (far, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 2 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2010 03:30 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn Walker on 8/31/10. (Attachments: # 1 VRW Standing Order DISREGARD, # 2 Standing Order - DISREGARD)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/8/2010: # 3 Standing Order, # 4 Standing Order) (cgk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/8/2010 (cgk, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2010 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF BASED ON VIOLATIONS OF DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT; COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; FEDERAL UNFAIR COMPETITION; TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT; AND CALIFORNIA UNFAIR COMPETITION. DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against WWW.SHOPPSJAILBREAK.COM, Zoomba LDC ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611050033.). Filed bySony Computer Entertainment America LLC. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (far, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC v. Zoomba LDC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Computer Entertainment America LLC
Represented By: Timothy R. Cahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoomba LDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WWW.SHOPPSJAILBREAK.COM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?