Nix v. Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Verdia Nix
Defendant: Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03914
Filed: September 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re-opening class claim period and continuing Final Approval Hearing to 08/19/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Notice to be mailed to newly identified class members on 06/10/13. Supplemental briefing due by 08/01/13. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/06/13. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER by the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson granting 128 Plaintiffs' second motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees and costs and payment of incentive awards to the Class Representatives shall be filed by 04/01/13. Plaintiffs' motion for judgment and final approval of the settlement shall be filed by 05/20/13.(tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER for supplemental briefing and ORDER continuing hearing on 119 Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. Joint supplemental brief due by 11/26/12. Motion hearing set for 12/10/12 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/14/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Vacate Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/28/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference re 112 : Further Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/21/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/14/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/30/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER vacating 90 Order to Show Cause. The 04/02/12 order to show cause hearing is vacated. Plaintiff's counsel may expect the imposition of monetary sanctions for any future violations of this Court's orders or local rules. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/28/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why monetary sanctions should not be imposed against Plaintiff's counsel for failure to timely pay Special Master's fees. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 04/02/12 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 03/26/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/19/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING re 73 Letter filed by Anka Behavioral Health, Inc., to exceed page limitation for the settlement conference statement. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/6/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING re 59 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference: Case Management Conference re-set for 3/5/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 1/18/2012. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Defendant's request for referral to early settlement conference. The parties shall proceed with private mediation as scheduled. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/30/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/31/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 17 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Plaintiff's second amended complaint due on or before 05/09/11. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 05/31/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to file a responsive pleading. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 6/20/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/05/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nix v. Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verdia Nix
Represented By: Jessica Juarez
Represented By: Stanley Scott Mallison
Represented By: Hector R. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anka Behavioral Health, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Oliver Thompson, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?