Mapes v. City of Union City et al
Plaintiff: Laura Mapes
Defendant: City of Union City and Carlos Rodriguez
Case Number: 3:2010cv03922
Filed: September 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re 30 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference filed by City of Union City. Case Management Conference re-set for 5/27/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/18/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2011 AT 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/1/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO REASSIGN ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/23/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: 13 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/08/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: 9 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/20/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mapes v. City of Union City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Mapes
Represented By: Denise Eaton-May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Union City
Represented By: Edward Louis Kreisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Rodriguez
Represented By: Edward Louis Kreisberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?