Yates v. Auto City 76 et al
Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Defendant: Auto City 76, R.A.T. Oil Inc and Canadian American Oil Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv03932
Filed: September 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 109 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Dismissal filed by Craig Yates. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/12/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - AMENDED ORDER Granting 86 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Notice of Further Settlement Conference and Further Settlement Conference Order: Further Settlement Conference set 11/20/2014 03:00 PM re 99 Further Settlement Conference Minute Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/4/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 86 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that Plaintiff, Craig Yates be excused from physically attending the Settlement Conference set for 11/4/2014 at 11:00 AM, but that he participate telephonically re 95 Letter filed by Craig Yates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/30/14. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ALLOWING re 79 Notice of Appearance by Phone filed by Craig Yates. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Craig Yates, Motions terminated: 69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Injunctive Relief; Memo of P&A; [Proposed] Order; Certificate of Service filed by Canadian American Oil Company, R.A.T. Oil Inc, Auto City 76, 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Craig Yates. 1/2/14 hearing vacated.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ON EQUITABLE ISSUE AT AUTO CITY 76 filed by Craig Yates. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 to Continue Case Management Conference Set for 2/14/13 filed by Canadian American Oil Company, R.A.T. Oil Inc, Auto City 76 Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/25/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2012 to NOVEMBER 2, 2012 filed by Craig Yates Case Management Statement due by 10/26/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/2/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/5/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 9/14/12 re 39 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUGUST 7, 2012 filed by Craig Yates Case Management Statement due by 9/7/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER FOLLOWING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/20/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Following Settlement Conference. Telephonic further settlement conference set for 7/18/2012 04:15 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/9/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re ATTENDANCE: Thomas Saberi will be allowed to represent all defendants at the 7/27/2011 mediation; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/21/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 13 Stipulation filed by Canadian American Oil Company, R.A.T. Oil Inc, Auto City 76. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Auto City 76 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto City 76
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.A.T. Oil Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian American Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?