Crosthwaite et al v. Bay Cities Concrete Pumping Inc.
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund and Operating Engineers Local 3
Defendant: Bay Cities Concrete Pumping Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv03939
Filed: September 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND ORDERING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT TO AN AUDIT by Judge Alsup granting 26 Motion for Default Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/31/2011 08:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 28, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup [denying 20 Motion to Vacate 20 MOTION to Vacate Case Management Conference; Or To Continue; [Proposed] Order Thereon MOTION to Vacate Case Management Conference; Or To Continue; [Proposed] Order Thereon]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 17 MOTION to Vacate Case Management Conference; Or to Continue; [Proposed] Order Thereon MOTION to Vacate Case Management Conference; Or to Continue; [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Operating Engine ers Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California, F. G. Crosthwaite, Operating Engineers Local 3, Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Russell E. Burns, Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund]. Joint case management statement is due 1/6/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/8/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosthwaite et al v. Bay Cities Concrete Pumping Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Trust Fund For Northern California
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 3
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Cities Concrete Pumping Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?