Daniels v. Lewis
Petitioner: Darryl Daniels
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Case Number: 3:2010cv04032
Filed: September 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 01/17/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 6 Ex Parte Application for Extension of t ime to File Answer or Otherwise Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the cases (C-10-1770CRB & C-10-432JSW) are NOT RELATED re 5 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Greg Lewis. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE 3 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Darryl Daniels. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 13, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darryl Daniels
Represented By: Robert Joseph Beles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?