Center for Food Safety et al v. Vilsack
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club and High Mowing Organic Seeds
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Not Yet Classified: Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. and American Crystal Sugar Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv04038
Filed: September 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2013 Filing 333 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 13, 2013 Filing 332 MANDATE of USCA as to #322 Notice of Appeal, filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, #319 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
December 18, 2012 Filing 331 USCA Memorandum as to #322 Notice of Appeal, filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, #319 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER of USCA as to #322 Notice of Appeal, filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER of USCA as to #322 Notice of Appeal, filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, #319 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
August 3, 2011 Filing 328 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kateryna L. Rakowsky (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 327 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club for proceedings held on 10/22/10;11/02/10;11/03/10;11/04/11 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 326 USCA Case Number 11-16564 9th Circuit for #322 Notice of Appeal, filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 325 USCA Case Number 11-16468 9th Circuit for #319 Notice of Appeal, filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 324 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #322 Notice of Appeal, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 323 Representation Statement by American Crystal Sugar Company, Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. re #322 Notice of Appeal, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 322 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #315 Judgment, #314 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by American Crystal Sugar Company, Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455-#34611061297. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 10, 2011 Filing 321 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #319 Notice of Appeal, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 320 Representation Statement by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club re #319 Notice of Appeal, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 319 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #315 Judgment, #314 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. Filing fee $ 455#34611060746. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 318 AMENDED MANDATE of USCA as to #230 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Monsanto Company, #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 317 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 316 MANDATE of USCA as to #230 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Monsanto Company, #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 315 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/14/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #307 Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 1, 2011 Filing 313 Joinder re #307 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as Moot by Monsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
April 1, 2011 Filing 312 REPLY (re #307 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as Moot ) filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 311 RESPONSE (re #307 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as Moot ) filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #309 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #310 Order on Motion to Continue. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 309 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luther L. Hajek, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 308 USCA JUDGMENT -REVERSED as to #230 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Monsanto Company, #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack, #224 Notice of Appeal filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 307 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as Moot filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of John Cordts, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 306 REDACTION Per Order #304 Sealing Portions of PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed on 2/17/11 by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 305 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #304 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages,, PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed on 2/17/11 by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS FOR ADMINSTRATIVE RELIEF. by Judge Jeffrey S. White (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER DENYING #298 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO RELATE CASES. by Judge Jeffrey S. White (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 302 REPLY (re #298 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 Filing 301 RESPONSE (re #298 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting doc #267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal portions of opposition to Plaintiffs' second motion for temporary restraining order and portions of declarations of Vic Jaro and Andy Povey. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting, doc #270 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the confidential portions of the opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 298 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 296 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Perry, #2 Exhibit A - Stipulated Protective Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 295 NOTICE by Thomas J. Vilsack re #274 Errata, #271 Response ( Non Motion ) of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Li, Beverly) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 294 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply in Response to Plaintiffs' Reply filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Surreply (Redacted), #3 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 293 REDACTION per document # 290 Order Sealing Portions of PLAINTIFFS [SECOND] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed 2/10/11 by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 292 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #290 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS [SECOND] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #262 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 289 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Richardson Womack (Womack, Eric) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 288 REPLY (re #256 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ) filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 287 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Center for Food Safety. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul H. Achitoff, #2 Proposed Order)(Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 286 Declaration of Paige M. Declaration IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS [SECOND] MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 285 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS [SECOND] MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Center for Food Safety. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli, #2 Manual Filing Notification, #3 Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #269 Administrative Motion for Leave to File an Oversized Brief. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #268 Administrative Motion to Exceed the Otherwise Applicable Page Limitations. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 282 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #273 Response ( Non Motion ), #277 Declaration in Support, #280 Declaration in Support, #279 Declaration in Support, #278 Declaration in Support, #281 Proposed Order, #275 Declaration in Support, #276 Declaration in Support (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 281 Proposed Order re #273 Response ( Non Motion ) by Monsanto Company. (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 280 Declaration of Kurt Wickstrom in Support of #273 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 279 Declaration of Larry Ronsberg in Support of #273 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 278 Declaration of Andy Povey (Redacted) in Support of #273 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 277 Declaration of Bryan Meier in Support of #273 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 276 Declaration of Vic Jaro (Redacted) in Support of #273 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #273 ) (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 275 Declaration of Janice M. Schneider in Support of #273 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #273 ) (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 274 ERRATA re #271 Response ( Non Motion ) (corrected to include Table of Contents and Table of Authorities) by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Li, Beverly) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 273 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Redacted) by Monsanto Company. (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 272 Declaration of Daniel Colacicco in Support of #271 Response ( Non Motion ) to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Related document(s) #271 ) (Li, Beverly) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 271 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Redacted) by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Li, Beverly) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 270 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Portions of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Hajek Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 269 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 268 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Filing 267 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Marraro in Support of Administrative Request to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher Marraro in Support of Administrative Request to File Under Seal, #3 Proposed Order)(Keteltas, Gilbert) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 266 RESPONSE (re #256 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ) filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Li, Beverly) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 265 Memorandum in Opposition re #256 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Philip) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER setting briefing schedule re motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 263 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli in Support of Plaintiffs' [Second] Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 262 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Tomaselli Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Manual Filing Notification)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White setting tentative briefing schedule; tentatively granting #258 Motion to Shorten Time (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 259 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli in Support of #258 MOTION to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #258 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 258 MOTION to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 257 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli in Support of #256 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #256 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 7, 2011 Filing 256 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Center for Food Safety. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #251 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/19/2011. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 255 (UNDER SEAL) Administrative Record in CD format re #254 filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Related document(s) #254 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 252 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 251 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Portions of the Administrative Record filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Third Hajek Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Index to Confidential Administrative Record, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stipulated Protective Order, #4 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 250 NOTICE by Thomas J. Vilsack re #249 Notice (Other) of Filing of the Administrative Record Supplement (Attachments: #1 Certification of Administrative Record Supplement, #2 Index to Corrected Files, #3 Index to Supplemental Documents)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 13, 2011 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #230 Amended Notice of Appeal, #227 Notice of Appeal, #224 Notice of Appeal (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 11, 2011 Received Document Administrative Record (CD) by Thomas J. Vilsack. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 249 NOTICE by Thomas J. Vilsack of the Filing of the Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Certification of the Administrative Record, #2 Index to the Administrative Record)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER of USCA as to #230 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Monsanto Company, #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER of USCA as to #230 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Monsanto Company, #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER of USCA as to #230 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Monsanto Company, #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack, #224 Notice of Appeal filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING #244 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference and to Set a Deadline for the Filing of the Administrative Record. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/13/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 244 STIPULATION re #2 ADR Scheduling Order to Continue the Case Management Conference and to Set a Deadline for the Filing of the Administrative Record by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER of USCA as to #230 Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Monsanto Company, #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack, #224 Notice of Appeal filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 242 Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 241 RESPONSE to re #232 Order Requiring Supplemental Explanation by Center for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 240 ANSWER to Complaint byThomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 239 OBJECTIONS to re #231 Proposed Order Regarding Preliminary Injunction by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 238 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #221 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, and re #223 Amended Order - permitting filing under seal - PLAINTIFFS' CLOSING REPLY BRIEF by Center for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 237 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #221 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, and re #223 Amended Order - permitting filing under seal PLAINTIFFS' CLOSING BRIEF by Center for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 236 REDACTION PLAINTIFFS CLOSING REPLY BRIEF filed per 12/1/10 Order, Doc. # 223 by Center for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 235 REDACTION PLAINTIFFS' CLOSING BRIEF filed per 12/1/10 Order, Doc. # 223 by Center for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 234 USCA Case Number 10-17722 9th Circuit for #227 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 233 USCA Case Number 10-17719 9th Circuit for #224 Notice of Appeal filed by American Crystal Sugar Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc., Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Requiring Supplemental Explanation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 2, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 231 Proposed Order re #223 Order [PROPOSED] PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Center for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 230 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Monsanto Company. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 1/3/2011. (Perry, Philip) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 229 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #227 Notice of Appeal, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 2, 2010 Filing 226 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #224 Notice of Appeal (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 228 Representation Statement by Thomas J. Vilsack re #227 Notice of Appeal. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #92 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Shorten Time Order on Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief, #173 Order on Motion for Leave to File, #223 Order by Thomas J. Vilsack. Filing fee $ 455-WAIVED. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 225 Representation Statement by American Crystal Sugar Company, Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc. re #224 Notice of Appeal (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 224 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #221 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by American Crystal Sugar Company, Betaseed, Inc., Monsanto Company, Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455-#34611053376. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Amended Order Regarding Remedies. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 1, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 30, 2010 Filing 222 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #221 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, Defendants' and Intervenor-Defendants' Joint Post-Hearing Brief by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Keteltas, Gilbert) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 30, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated on #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #216 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kyle McClain (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #217 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 218 Declaration of Luther L. Hajek in Support of #217 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #217 ) (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 217 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Food Safety re #214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Closing Reply Brief (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 214 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Closing Reply Brief filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Manual Filing Notification)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 216 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Kyle McClain to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275.00, receipt number 34611052830.) filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' and Intervenor-Defendants' Joint Post-Hearing Brief filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher H. Marraro, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Christopher H. Marraro, #3 Proposed Order)(Keteltas, Gilbert) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 212 Brief (Defendants' and Intervenor-Defendants' Joint Post-Hearing Brief) filed byMonsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 10, 2010 Filing 211 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Food Safety re #210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' CLOSING BRIEF - REVISED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' CLOSING BRIEF filed by Center for Food Safety. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Manual Filing Notification, #5 Certficate of Service)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 209 NOTICE by Center for Food Safety CORRECTION OF DOCKET #203 . (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 208 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #209 . *** NOTICE by Center for Food Safety CORRECTION OF DOCKET #202 . (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/9/2010) Modified on 11/9/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2010 Filing 207 Declaration of Paige Tomaselli in Support of #206 Notice (Other) of Plaintiffs' Counter-Designations for the Deposition Testimony of Thomas Stearns filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #206 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 206 NOTICE by Center for Food Safety of Plaintiffs' Counter-Designations for the Deposition Testimony of Thomas Stearns (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #201 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christine G. Rolph (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #200 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John F. Bruce (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 203 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #209 . *** NOTICE by Center for Food Safety of Plaintiffs' Counter-Designations to Intervenors' Deposition Testimony Presented During Evidentiary Hearing (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/9/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 Filing 202 Statement Requesting Clarification by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 199 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-4-10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, Telephone number 415-373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 198 NOTICE by Monsanto Company Intervenor-Defendants Deposition Testimony Presented During the Preliminary Injunction Evidentiary Hearing (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 197 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Monsanto Company. Amendment to #190 Exhibit List Third Amended Joint Exhibit List Re Evidentiary Hearing. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 196 Minute Entry: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/4/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 11/4/2010). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 195 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-3-10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, Telephone number 415-373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 194 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-3-10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, Telephone number 415-373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 193 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Monsanto Company. Amendment to #190 Exhibit List Second Amended Joint Exhibit List Re Evidentiary Hearing. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 192 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Monsanto Company. Amendment to #190 Exhibit List Amended Joint Exhibit List Re Evidentiary Hearing. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 191 Minute Entry: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/3/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 11/3/2010). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 190 Exhibit List re: Evidentiary Hearing by Monsanto Company.. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 189 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-2-10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, Telephone number 415-373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 188 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-2-10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, Telephone number 415-373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2011. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 187 OBJECTIONS to Federal Defendant and Intervenor-Defendants' Exhibits by Center for Food Safety. (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 186 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED EXHIBIT LIST BY iNTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS by Monsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 185 Minute Entry: Evidentiary Hearing held on 11/2/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 11/2/2010). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 184 Memorandum in Opposition re #171 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Presentation Evidence by Defendants Regarding the Likelihood That Plaintiffs Will Suffer Irreparable Harm filed byMonsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 183 Memorandum in Opposition re #171 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Presentation Evidence by Defendants Regarding the Likelihood That Plaintiffs Will Suffer Irreparable Harm filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 182 Memorandum in Opposition re #175 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Presentation of Evidence Concerning Monetary Harm Resulting from an Injunction Barring Illegal Activity filed byMonsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 181 Declaration of Paige Tomaselli in Support of #180 Memorandum in Opposition to Intervenors' Motion in Limine, No. 2 filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 180 Memorandum in Opposition re #176 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Exhibits filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 201 MOTION of Christine G. Rolph for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052331.) filed by Monsanto Company. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2010 Filing 179 NOTICE by Monsanto Company Regarding Intervenor-Defendants' Intention to Introduce Deposition Testimony (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #176 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Exhibits, #177 Declaration in Support, (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 177 Declaration of Drew C. Ensign in Support of #176 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Exhibits filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #176 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 176 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Certain Plaintiffs' Exhibits filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 175 Second MOTION in Limine to Exclude Presentation of Evidence Concerning Monetary Harm Resulting from an Injunction Barring Illegal Activity filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 2)(Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting as modified #159 Motion for Telephonic Witness Testimony; denying #168 Motion in Limine (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/5/2010 (rcs, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying #151 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 172 Proposed Order re #171 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Presentation Evidence by Defendants Regarding the Likelihood That Plaintiffs Will Suffer Irreparable Harm by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 171 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Any Presentation Evidence by Defendants Regarding the Likelihood That Plaintiffs Will Suffer Irreparable Harm filed by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #154 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Gilbert S. Keteltas (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #153 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher H. Marraro (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 168 MOTION in Limine No. 1: To Exclude Conjectural Evidence Unrelated to Plaintiffs' Proposed Remedy filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 167 Declaration of Kateryna L. Rakowsky (Second) in Support of #166 Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion Regarding Telephonic Witness Testimony filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #166 ) (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 166 Reply to Opposition re #159 MOTION Regarding Telephonic Witness Testimony filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 165 NOTICE by Center for Food Safety of Intention to File Confidential Documents (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 31, 2010 Filing 164 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #162 Memorandum in Opposition, #163 Declaration in Support (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/31/2010)
October 31, 2010 Filing 163 Declaration of Drew C. Ensign in Support of #162 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #162 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/31/2010)
October 31, 2010 Filing 162 Memorandum in Opposition re #159 MOTION Regarding Telephonic Witness Testimony filed byMonsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/31/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 200 MOTION by John F. Bruce for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052289.) filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010) (rcs, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 161 Declaration of Doug Gurian-Sherman in Support of #159 MOTION Regarding Telephonic Witness Testimony filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #159 ) (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 160 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli (Third) in Support of #159 MOTION Regarding Telephonic Witness Testimony filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #159 ) (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 159 MOTION Regarding Telephonic Witness Testimony filed by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Leave to Present Telephonic Witness Testimony)(Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DENYING #90 MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 29, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 157 RESPONSE to re #140 Declaration in Support, #139 Declaration in Support, #141 Declaration in Support, #138 Declaration in Support by Monsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 156 Memorandum in Opposition re #151 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ,B.***INCOMPLETE DOCKET ENTRY. FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #158 *** ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING #90 Motion to Transfer Case. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010) Modified on 10/29/2010 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 152 Statement Requesting Clarification by Center for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 151 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #142 Request Regarding Equipment as Modified (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #135 Motion to Intervene (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 148 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Luther L. Hajek, #2 Exhibit 5 - Protective Order, #3 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 147 Memorandum in Opposition re #142 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Presentation Equipment filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 146 Reply Memorandum re #135 MOTION to Intervene filed byAmerican Crystal Sugar Company. (Lichtman, Joanne) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 145 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/22/10, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2011. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 144 Memorandum in Opposition re #135 MOTION to Intervene filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 143 Declaration of Gilbert S. Keteltas in Support of #142 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Presentation Equipment filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #142 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 27, 2010 Filing 142 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief Regarding Presentation Equipment filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 154 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Gilbert S. Keteltas ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052093.) filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 153 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher H. Marraro ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611052093.) filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 141 Declaration of Matthew Dillon Establishing That Posting a Non-Nominal Bond Would Cause Undue Hardship filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 140 Declaration of Tom Stearns Establishing That Posting a Non-Nominal Bond Would Cause Undue Hardship filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 139 Declaration of Aaron Isherwood Establishing That Posting a Non-Nominal Bond Would Cause Undue Hardship filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 138 Declaration of Andrew Kimbrell Establishing That Posting a Non-Nominal Bond Would Cause Undue Hardship filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Regarding American Crystal's Motion to Intervene and Shorten Time. Signed by Judge William Alsup for Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 26, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 136 Declaration of Larry Ronsberg in Support of #135 MOTION to Intervene filed byAmerican Crystal Sugar Company. (Related document(s) #135 ) (Lichtman, Joanne) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 135 MOTION to Intervene filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lichtman, Joanne) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 134 MOTION to Shorten Time for hearing on American Crystals Motion to Intervene filed by American Crystal Sugar Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - American Crystals Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Order)(Lichtman, Joanne) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 Filing 133 Declaration of Natalia Weinsetel filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Li, Beverly) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER REGARDING EVIDENTIARY HEARING: Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/2/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Continued Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/3/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Continued Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/4/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 131 Minute Entry: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing - Non-evidentiary held on 10/22/2010 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 10/22/2010). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. #131 Temporary Restraining Order Hearing - Non-evidentiary. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 130 Amended Notice of Questions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 21, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 20, 2010 Filing 129 Notice of Questions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 20, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 128 Reply to Opposition re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 19, 2010 Filing 127 Reply to Opposition re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byMonsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 126 Declaration of PAUL H. ACHTOFF in Support of #123 Memorandum in Opposition To Defendant-Intervenors' Administrative Motion to Vacate Hearing filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #123 ) (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 125 Declaration of PAIGE M. TOMASELLI in Support of #123 Memorandum in Opposition To Defendant-Intervenors' Administrative Motion to Vacate Hearing filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #123 ) (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 124 Declaration of KATERYNA L. RAKOWSKY in Support of #123 Memorandum in Opposition filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #123 ) (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 123 Memorandum in Opposition re #121 MOTION to Vacate Hearing and Schedule Case Management Conference in Its Place filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 122 Declaration of Harry Zerlin in Support of #121 MOTION to Vacate Hearing and Schedule Case Management Conference in Its Place filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 Filing 121 MOTION to Vacate Hearing and Schedule Case Management Conference in Its Place filed by Monsanto Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re: #121 MOTION to Vacate Hearing and Schedule Case Management Conference in Its Place ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION WAS CALENDARED IN ERROR . (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 120 Declaration of George A. Kimbrell in Support of #119 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Remedies Brief filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Kimbrell Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Kimbrell Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Kimbrell Declaration)(Related document(s) #119 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 119 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Remedies Brief filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 118 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli in Support of #117 Memorandum in Opposition to Federal Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #117 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 117 Memorandum in Opposition re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 116 Reply Memorandum re #102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SEPARATE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed byBetaseed, Inc.. (Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 11, 2010 Filing 115 Memorandum in Opposition to Intervenor-Defendant Betaseed's Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Separate Supplemental Brief Under Seal filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 10/11/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 114 Declaration of Michael Gregoire in Support of #109 Memorandum in Opposition filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #109 ) (Li, Beverly) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 113 Declaration of John Cordts in Support of #109 Memorandum in Opposition filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Related document(s) #109 ) (Li, Beverly) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 112 Declaration of Linda Pardoe in Support of #109 Memorandum in Opposition filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 2c, #5 Exhibit 2d, #6 Exhibit 2e, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #109 ) (Li, Beverly) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 111 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #108 Declaration in Support, #105 Memorandum in Opposition, #110 Declaration in Support, #106 Declaration in Support, #107 Declaration in Support (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 110 Declaration of Kurt Wickstrom in Support of #105 Memorandum in Opposition (Redacted) filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #105 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 109 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Remedies Brief filed byThomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 108 Declaration of Bryan Meier in Support of #105 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #105 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 107 Declaration of Drew C. Ensign in Support of #105 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #105 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 106 Declaration of Jeffrey Bottoms in Support of #105 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #105 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 105 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Supplemental) filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Kurt Wickstrom filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harry Zirlin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Betaseed, Inc. re #102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SEPARATE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF (Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SEPARATE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION, #2 Proposed Order)(Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Stanley H. Abramson (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Lattimore (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 99 Brief re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - SUPPLEMENTAL REMEDIES BRIEF filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Achitoff, Paul) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 96 Joinder re #90 MOTION to Transfer Case by Monsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 98 Proposed Order re #97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611051133.) by Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Rachel Lattimore ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611051133.) filed by Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 95 Proposed Order re #94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611051134.) by Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Stanley H. Abramson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611051134.) filed by Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 28, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part #31 Motion to Intervene; granting #37 Motion to Shorten Time; granting in part and denying in part #38 Motion to Intervene; granting #40 Motion to Shorten Time; granting #44 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting #55 Motion to Shorten Time; granting #26 Motion to Shorten Time; granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion to Intervene; addressing Application for Temporary Restraining Order (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Janice M. Schneider (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 28, 2010 Set Hearing on #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 90 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Food Safety re #88 Reply to Opposition of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 88 Reply to Opposition of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Food Safety re #80 Memorandum in Opposition, #82 Declaration in Support, #81 Declaration in Support, #83 Declaration in Support, #84 Declaration in Support, (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 84 Declaration of Frank Morton (Second) in Support of #80 Memorandum in Opposition to Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Substantive Brief as Amicus Curiae filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 83 Declaration of William Wenzel in Support of #80 Memorandum in Opposition to Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Substantive Brief as Amicus Curiae filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Wenzel Declaration)(Related document(s) #80 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 82 Declaration of George A. Kimbrell in Support of #80 Memorandum in Opposition to Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Substantive Brief as Amicus Curiae filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Kimbrell Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Kimbrell Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Kimbrell Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Kimbrell Declaration)(Related document(s) #80 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 81 Declaration of Andrew Deeringer in Support of #80 Memorandum in Opposition to Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Substantive Brief as Amicus Curiae filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Deeringer Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Deeringer Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Deeringer Declaration)(Related document(s) #80 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 80 Memorandum in Opposition to Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' Proposed Substantive Brief as Amicus Curiae filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Food Safety re #72 Initial Scheduling Order, (Rakowsky, Kateryna) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #77 Proposed Order, #76 Declaration in Support, #74 Memorandum in Opposition, #75 Declaration in Support (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 77 Proposed Order re #74 Memorandum in Opposition by Monsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 76 Declaration of Kurt Wickstrom in Support of #74 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #74 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 75 Declaration of Bryan Meier in Support of #74 Memorandum in Opposition filed byMonsanto Company. (Related document(s) #74 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 74 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 73 Statement of Nonopposition to Proposed Defendant-Intervenors Motions to Intervene and Joint Motion to File a Brief of Amicus Curiae by Center for Food Safety. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2010.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Regarding Motions to Intervene and Joint Motion to File Brief as Amici Curaie. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 21, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/21/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 87 Proposed Order re #86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005731.) by Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Filing 86 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Janice M. Schneider ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005731.) filed by Monsanto Company. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER OF RECUSAL (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Armstrong granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Nancy Bryson (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Armstrong granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Alison Suthers (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/20/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 9/20/10 that due to the unavailability of Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, the Executive Committee directs the clerk to re-assign this action. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 63 NOTICE by Betaseed, Inc. re #27 MOTION to Intervene TO LODGE ANSWER OF [PROPOSED] INTERVENOR-DEFENDANT BETASEED, INC. IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 17, 2010 Filing 62 Certificate of Interested Entities by Syngenta Seeds, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Seeds JV CV B.V., Other Affiliate Syngenta Participations AG, Other Affiliate Syngenta AG, Other Affiliate Syngenta Corporation for Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement And Civil Local Rule 3-16 Certification Of Interested) (Lazerwitz, David) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Harry Zirlin. Signed by Judge Armstrong on 9/16/2010. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Paul H. Atchitoff (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for George Andreas Kimbrell (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William C. Weeks (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 See document #66 for correct attachment.ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Harry Zirlin (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Abuhoff (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Food Safety re #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DECLARATION OF LORI ANN BURD; DECLARATION OF NEIL CARMAN; DECLARATION OF MARK DES MARETS; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW DILLON; DECLARATION OF LAUREL HOPWOOD; DECLARATION OF ANDREW KIMBRELL; DECLARATION OF FRANK MORTON; DECLARATION OF TOM STEARNS; DECLARATION OF DON TIPPING (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 55 Joint MOTION to Shorten Time and Memorandum in Support filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 54 Declaration of DON TIPPING in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 53 Declaration of TOM STEARNS in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 52 Declaration of FRANK MORTON in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 51 Declaration of ANDREW KIMBRELL in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 50 Declaration of LAUREL HOPWOOD in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 49 Declaration of MARK DES MARETS in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 48 Declaration of MATTHEW DILLON in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 47 Declaration of NEIL CARMAN in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 46 Declaration of LORI ANN BURD in Support of #45 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 45 Reply Memorandum re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byCenter for Food Safety. (Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 44 Joint MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Monsanto Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Amicus Brief, #3 Declaration of Larry Ronsberg, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Nancy Bryson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005701.) filed by Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Alison Suthers ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005700.) filed by Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Betaseed, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate KWS SAAT AG for Betaseed, Inc.. (Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION to Shorten Time re #38 Motion to Intervene filed by Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lazerwitz, David) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 39 Declaration of Bryan Meier in Support of #38 Motionto Intervene filed by Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Lazerwitz, David) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 38 MOTION to Intervene; Memorandum In Support, filed by Syngenta Seeds, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Lazerwitz, David) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 37 MOTION to Shorten Time; Memorandum in Support re #31 Motion to Intervene filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #35 Proposed Order, #31 Motion to Intervene and Memorandum in Support , #32 Declaration in Support, #33 Declaration in Support, #34 Declaration in Support (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/15/2010) (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 35 Proposed Order re #31 Motion to Intervene by Monsanto Company. (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 34 Declaration of Stephen P. Welker in Support of #31 Motion to Intervene filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #31 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 33 Declaration of Ronald W. Schneider in Support of #31 Motion to Intervene filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #31 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 32 Declaration of Drew C. Ensign in Support of #31 Motion to Intervene filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #31 ) (Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION to Intervene; Memorandum in Support, filed by Monsanto Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer)(Ensign, Drew) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND BRIEFING ORDER: Opposition due by 3:00 PM on 09/14/10; Reply due by 12:00 PM on 09/16/10 re #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 29 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #41 *** CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES, filed by Betaseed, Inc. (Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 28 Declaration of Kurt Wickstrom in Support of #27 Motion to Intervene filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Related document(s) #27 ) (Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Intervene, filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Edmiston, Walter) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William C. Weeks ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005699.) filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Harry Zirlin ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005699.) filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Abuhoff ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005699.), filed by Betaseed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 22 Declaration of Luther L. Hajek in Support of #21 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2010 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thomas J. Vilsack. (Hajek, Luther) (Filed on 9/14/2010) Modified on 9/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 Filing 20 STIPULATION: Regarding Briefing Schedule on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club, Thomas J. Vilsack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomaselli, Paige) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File re #12 , #13 , #14 & #15 . (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club re #17 Proposed Order, #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #16 Proposed Order, (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 17 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order re #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 Filing 16 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order re #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 15 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli in Support of (Part III of III) #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (Related document(s) #11 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 14 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli in Support of (Part II of III) #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (Related document(s) #11 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2019: #1 Affidavit Part II, #2 Affidavit Part III, #3 Affidavit Part IV) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 13 Declaration of Paige M. Tomaselli in Support of (Part I of III) #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (Related document(s) #11 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 12 Declaration of Paul H. Achitoff in Support of #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, filed byCenter for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (Related document(s) #11 ) (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Relate Case C-08-0484-JSW, filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611050389.) by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Paul H. Atchitoff ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611050389.) filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 Filing 7 Proposed Order re #6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611050388.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611050388.) by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice George Andreas Kimbrell ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611050388.) filed by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Thomas J. Vilsack, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and Cindy Smith Administrator, APHIS. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 3 Nongovernmental Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Food Safety, High Mowing Organic Seeds, Organic Seed Alliance, Sierra Club (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2010 03:00 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas J. Vilsack ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611050387.). Filed byOrganic Seed Alliance, Center for Food Safety, Sierra Club, High Mowing Organic Seeds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Food Safety et al v. Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Food Safety
Represented By: George Andreas Kimbrell
Represented By: Kateryna L. Rakowsky
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Represented By: Paul Henry Achitoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Seed Alliance
Represented By: Kateryna L. Rakowsky
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Kateryna L. Rakowsky
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Mowing Organic Seeds
Represented By: Kateryna L. Rakowsky
Represented By: Paige Michele Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Represented By: Beverly Li
Represented By: Eric Richardson Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Betaseed, Inc.
Represented By: William Copley Jhaveri-Weeks
Represented By: Walter Allan Edmiston
Represented By: Daniel M. Abuhoff
Represented By: Harry Zirlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Christine Mary Gregorski Rolph
Represented By: Drew Curtis Ensign
Represented By: Janice M. Schneider
Represented By: Kyle McClain
Represented By: Philip Jonathan Perry
Represented By: Rachel Gold Lattimore
Represented By: Stanley H Abramson,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Syngenta Seeds, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Lazerwitz
Represented By: Alison Suthers
Represented By: Nancy Southard Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: American Crystal Sugar Company
Represented By: John F. Bruce
Represented By: Joanne Lichtman
Represented By: Christopher H. Marraro
Represented By: Gilbert S. Keteltas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?