Azibo-boynton et al v. City of Pinole et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton and Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr.
Defendant: City of Pinole, City of Richmond, Tim Couwels, Chris Fodor, Zach Blume, Paul M. Clancy and Chris Magnus
Case Number: 3:2010cv04151
Filed: September 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/14/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 29 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/14/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 4/14/2011). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/14/2011)
April 11, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 4/11/11. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 8, 2011 Filing 28 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 4/11/11 at 1:30 p.m. PST. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 712-775-7300 and use access code 847955 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Edrington, Peter) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 26 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton, Zach Blume, City of Pinole, City of Richmond, Paul M. Clancy, Tim Couwels, Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Chris Fodor, Chris Magnus. (Willis, Linnea) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Edrington, Peter) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESET ALL DEADLINES. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/2/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 23 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RESET DEADLINES; PROPOSED ORDER THEREON by Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. (Willis, Linnea) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
January 24, 2011 Filing 22 City of Richmond and Chris Magnus' ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byZach Blume, City of Pinole, City of Richmond, Paul M. Clancy, Tim Couwels, Chris Fodor, Chris Magnus. (Edrington, Peter) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE: 20 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/14/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 14, 2011 ***Deadlines/Hearing terminated. 3 ADR Scheduling Order, Set/Reset Hearings. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 18 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Zach Blume, City of Pinole, Paul M. Clancy, Tim Couwels, Chris Fodor. (Edrington, Peter) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byZach Blume, City of Pinole, Paul M. Clancy, Tim Couwels, Chris Fodor. (Edrington, Peter) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 27, 2010 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. Chris Magnus served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. Paul M. Clancy served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. Zach Blume served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. Chris Fodor served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. Tim Couwels served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. City of Richmond served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 27, 2010 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. City of Pinole served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Zach Blume, City of Pinole, City of Richmond, Paul M. Clancy, Tim Couwels, Chris Fodor, Chris Magnus. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Continuance of Case Management Conference 7 Motion to Continue (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 15, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and All Associated Deadlines filed by Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton, Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr.. (Willis, Linnea) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 9, 2010 Filing 6 RESPONSE to re 5 Clerks Notice by Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton, Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr.. (Willis, Linnea) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE Requesting Address of Defendants (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting In Forma Pauperis and for Issuance of Process 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton, Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /no process against Zach Blume, City of Pinole, City of Richmond, Paul M. Clancy, Tim Couwels, Chris Fodor, Chris Magnus. Filed byEstate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr., Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azibo-boynton et al v. City of Pinole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ifetayo R. Azibo-boynton
Represented By: Linnea Nicole Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Levi B, Boynton, Jr.
Represented By: Linnea Nicole Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Couwels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Fodor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?