Perez v. Alameda County Sheriffs' Office et al
Plaintiff: Asha Perez
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriffs' Office, Steven Wolf, Matthew Farruggia, Dean Stavert, Donald Buchanan and Gregory Ahern
Case Number: 3:2010cv04181
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Sex Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENCE AND VACATING HEARING AND CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Selectio n set for 3/18/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/23/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/1/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINES: Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroo m 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Selection set for 2/25/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/7/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 70 STIPULATION To Continue CMC. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/13/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AS MOOT 33 Motion for Summary Judgment or Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 30, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING AND ORDER PERMITTING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 45 Stipulation re Use of Emotional Distress Evidence At Trial. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 12, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RESOLVING 29 Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 1, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Stipulation to Request Additional Time in Contemplation of Magistrate Jurisdiction.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Alameda County Sheriffs' Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asha Perez
Represented By: Arcolina Panto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriffs' Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Farruggia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Stavert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?