Hernandez et al v. Vilsack
Plaintiff: Raquel Hernandez and Carlos Hernandez
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Case Number: 3:2010cv04198
Filed: September 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/17/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER on Agreement of Compromise and Settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/20/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference reset to 6/19/2012 at 9:30 A.M. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/28/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/12/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER Selecting ADR Process, Referred to Mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/23/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to answer. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/1/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Hernandez
Represented By: Murlene L. Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Hernandez
Represented By: Murlene L. Randle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Vilsack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?