Islam v. Heinauer et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Islam
Defendant: F. Gerard Heinauer, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Janet Napolitano, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Robert S. Mueller and Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04222
Filed: September 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment; DENYING 16 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 11 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment and 16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and REQUESTING STATEMENT from Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 4, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 12 Stipulation To Reset Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 9 Stipulation Extension of Time for Defendants to File Responsive Pleadings. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Islam v. Heinauer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Islam
Represented By: Lina Baroudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Gerard Heinauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?