Randolph v. San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Plaintiff: Wesley S. Randolph, III
Defendant: San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Case Number: 3:2010cv04316
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 44 Stipulation filed by San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
April 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 34 Stipulation filed by San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley S. Randolph, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?