Santiago et al v. Amdocs, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patrick Santiago and Robert Schussel
Defendant: Amdocs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04317
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/29/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/14 is continued to 6/27/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/14/14, Motions terminated: 320 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Re Case Management Conference in Light of Settlement and Proposed Order Thereon filed by Robert Schussel, Patrick Santiago. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER, Motions terminated: 317 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation re Case Management Conference In Light of Settlement filed by Robert Schussel, Patrick Santiago. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/14/14 is continued to 4/18/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/5/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 303 Ex Parte Application for Tolling the Statutes of Limitations (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DECERTIFICATION AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 260 263 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 287 MOTION to Continue briefing and hearing dates of class cert motion (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER signed by Judge Susan Illston granting 282 Stipulation to continue motion to certify. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/15/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER Re: Deadlines for Motion for Class Certification and Motion to De-Certify, Motions terminated: 238 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re filed by Patrick Santiago. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2013 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/26/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE 231 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER, Motions terminated: 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue April 6, 2012 Case Management Conference Until April 20, 2012 filed by Robert Schussel, Patrick Santiago. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/2/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE ANSWER 164 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER BRIEFING AND RESCHEDULING HEARING TO MARCH 16, 2012 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER vacating all dates and deadlines re: class certification motion (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER continuing motion (with signature) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
April 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 80 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2011) Modified on 4/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND VACATING MOTION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2011 03:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting leave to file amended complaint re 9 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010) Modified on 12/1/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santiago et al v. Amdocs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amdocs, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Platte Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Santiago
Represented By: V James DeSimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schussel
Represented By: V James DeSimone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?