Glaser et al v. Advantage Financial et al
Plaintiff: Franklin E Glaser and Victoria Glaser
Defendant: Advantage Financial, Downey Savings & Loan, US Bank, N.A., DSL Service Company, FCIO Lender Service, Inc. and Alvernaz Partners, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv04325
Filed: September 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REMANDING CASE., Order granting in part Defendants' motion to dismiss. Motions terminated: 35 MOTION for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Alvernaz Partners, LLC, 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Am ended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted, Or In The Alternative For A More Definite Statement filed by DSL Service Company, FCIO Lender Service, Inc., US Bank, N.A., 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alvernaz Partners, LLC.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/5/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER VACATING OSC HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/1/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 THIRD ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 2/25/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/18/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING CMC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Second order directing Plaintiffs to file consent/declination.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/15/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/18/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/10/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaser et al v. Advantage Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin E Glaser
Represented By: Stevan John Henrioulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Glaser
Represented By: Stevan John Henrioulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advantage Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downey Savings & Loan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Eric M. Alderete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSL Service Company
Represented By: Eric M. Alderete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCIO Lender Service, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Alderete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvernaz Partners, LLC
Represented By: Peter Braun Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?