Gagner v. Southern Wine and Spirits of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Gagner and Hung Tran
Defendant: Southern Wine and Spirits of America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04405
Filed: September 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Bernardino
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REQUIRING Further Joint Submission re Cy Pres Recipients. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 7, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 STIPULATION Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 47 MOTION for PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF Settlement. FINAL APPROVAL Hearing set for 12/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION to Shorten Time RE: 47 MOTION for Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 STIPULATION Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/26/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on January 17, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 31 Stipulation RE: Magistrate Judges Authority to Enter Discovery and Settlement Conference Preparation Orders. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING 8 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 23, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADR DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/4/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gagner v. Southern Wine and Spirits of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Wine and Spirits of America, Inc.
Represented By: Clement Jon Kong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Gagner
Represented By: Morris J. Baller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hung Tran
Represented By: Morris J. Baller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?