Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Regis Corp.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Regis Corp.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04412
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CONSENT DECREE ***Civil Case Terminated.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/12/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 28 TO CONTINUE DEADLINES AND SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/22/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/31/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE. Stipulation filed by Supercuts Corporate Shops, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 15 TO DISMISS REGIS CORP. AS A DEFENDANT. Stipulation filed by Regis Corp. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/10/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME IN WHICH TO SUBMIT ADR PROCESS DEADLINE AND INITIAL DISCLOSURES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/23/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE 11 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Regis Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Marcia L. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regis Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?