Reynolds v. Applegate et al
Plaintiff: Annaleine Reynolds
Defendant: Dave Applegate, Adam Lankford, GMAC Mortgage, LLC and Executive Trustee Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv04427
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/24/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/12/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Applegate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annaleine Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Lankford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Trustee Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?