IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Miller Electric & Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund, IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund, Electrical Contractors Trust, Contractors Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Electrical Industry Service Corporation, Victor Uno and Don Campbell
Defendant: Miller Electric & Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04505
Filed: October 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 54 Ex Parte Application. The judgment debtor exam scheduled for April 18, 2013 will be continued to June 26, 2013.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 52 Order on Ex Parte Application Judgment Debtor Exam set for 4/17/2013 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/12/2013. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WRIT of Execution issued as to Miller Electric & Technology, Inc. in the amount of $91,235.61. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/12/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 12 Notice of Voluntary Partial Dismissal, filed by Contractors Administration Fund, IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund, Electrical Contractors Trust, IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Victor Uno, IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund, Electrical Industry Service Corporation, IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund, Don Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/08/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Miller Electric & Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Contractors Trust
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contractors Administration Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor Management Cooperation Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Industry Service Corporation
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Uno
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Campbell
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Electric & Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?