Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv04662
Filed: October 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation For Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 JOINT MOTION to Continue initial case management conference and related dates; stipulation to extend time to respond to complaint. Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 Joint Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Related Dates and Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Case Management Statement due by 6/24/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 13, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 14 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Dates. Case Management Statement due by 4/22/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to answer re 4 Stipulation filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation v. Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Louis Oliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?