Doe et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe and Anne Raskin
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Janice Madsen, Kym Dougherty, Audrey Hillman and Heather Grives
Case Number: 3:2010cv04700
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 224 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISMISSAL re 223 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/07/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER VACATING HEARING IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Thelton Henderson vacating 204 Motion for New Trial and setting further Case Management Conference for Monday, January 14, 2013, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12, U.S. District Court, San Francisco. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge Thelton Henderson denying 197 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing 204 MOTION for New Trial and Related Dates. Responses due by 6/25/2012. Replies due by 7/2/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/29/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 5/4/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 4/23/812. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 4/4/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 3/29/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO WITNESSES. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 3/27/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER ON TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 3/26/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER REGARDING ISSUES RAISED IN SECOND PRETRIAL STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 3/15/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Allowing Equipment Through Security for Trial. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER SETTING SECOND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Joint statement to be filed by 3/12/12. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 2/1/12. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE by Judge Thelton Henderson granting 107 Motion in Limine (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER ON MOTION REGARDING SPOLIATION by Judge Thelton Henderson denying 123 Motion for Sanctions (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton Henderson on 1/4/2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Allowing Equipment Through Security. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/19/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Thelton Henderson granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND by Judge Thelton Henderson denying 42 Motion to Amend/Correct(tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Dismissal of Defendant Audrey Hillman. Audrey Hillman terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/22/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Granting 48 Emergency Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' MSJ, Responses due by 11/4/2011 and Replies due by 11/11/2011. 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by all Defendants and 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint rescheduled for 11/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/31/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Hearing on 33 Joint Discovery Letter. Discovery Hearing set for 9/20/2011 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/13/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 31 parties' joint discovery letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/29/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice of Reference and ORDER Re Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/12/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED ORDER re 17 Order, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 2/16/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendant City and County of San Francisco to respond. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/07/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Mary Shea Hagebols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Raskin
Represented By: Mary Shea Hagebols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kym Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Grives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?