Lucia et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Karen Lucia and Jeffrey Lucia
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04749
Filed: October 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/27/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: 148 : Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/3/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 115 Motion to Relate Case 15-cv-2856-VC.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (117) Motion to Shorten Time in case 3:10-cv-04749-VC.Associated Cases: 3:10-cv-04749-VC, 3:10-cv-05072-VC, 3:11-cv-03884-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (113) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 3:10-cv-04749-VC.Associated Cases: 3:10-cv-04749-VC, 3:10-cv-05072-VC, 3:11-cv-03884-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (103) Stipulation Extending Deadlines Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5, in case 3:10-cv-04749-VC and related cases.Associated Cases: 3:10-cv-04749-VC, 3:10-cv-05072-VC, 3:11-cv-03884-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 90 Stipulation to Amend the Complaint.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria re 86 Discovery Letter Brief- Compelling Production of Plaintiffs' Tax Returns and Unemployment Records.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting (84) Stipulation and Scheduling Order in case 3:10-cv-04749-VC.Associated Cases: 3:10-cv-04749-VC, 3:10-cv-05072-VC, 3:11-cv-03884-VC(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/21/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING NON-WAIVER (66 in 4:10-cv-04749-JSW), (51 in 4:10-cv-05072-JSW). Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/9/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING re (13 in 3:10-cv-05072-JSW) MOTION to Dismiss and (23 in 3:10-cv-04749-JSW) MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 3, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/26/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 10, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 6, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucia et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lucia
Represented By: Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lucia
Represented By: Gretchen Arlene Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?