Banga v. Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv04758
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED ORDER re 43 Stipulation filed by Kamlesh Banga, Trans Union, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 3, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 14, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 9, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/7/2011. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC HEARING REQUEST; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. All parties shall participate in the Case Management Conference scheduled for February 4, 2011 by telephone. The Clerk shall initiate the call. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 27, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KAREN B. REISINGER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banga v. Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamlesh Banga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sumana Cooppan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?