Allstate Insurance Company v. McCullough et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Robert McCullough, Jr. and Alice Palmer Thomas
Case Number: 3:2010cv04819
Filed: October 25, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 17 Stipulation filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). All pending dates are vacated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 12 Request for telephonic appearance filed by Alice Palmer Thomas. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/25/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. McCullough et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McCullough, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Palmer Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?