Zuniga v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jean Zuniga
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 3:2010cv04823
Filed: October 25, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 33 Motion for Attorney Fees. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER for extension re 27 Stipulation, filed by Michael J. Astrue Motions due by 1/13/2012.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/16/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER fro extension to file motion re 25 Stipulation, filed by Michael J. Astrue Cross Motions due by 12/14/2011.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/16/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for extension of time re 18 Stipulation filed by Rhonda Jean Zuniga. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/26/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuniga v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Jean Zuniga
Represented By: Ian Michael Sammis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?