Fair Housing of Marin v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Fair Housing of Marin
Defendant: Robert Scott Thomas and Jean Paul Jurdo
Case Number: 3:2010cv04856
Filed: October 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISMISSAL CASE SUBJECT TO CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL ORDER re 21 Stipulation filed by Fair Housing of Marin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/16/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL ORDER PER CASE SETTLEMENT filed by Fair Housing of Marin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 Stipulation filed by Robert Scott Thomas Case Management Conference reset for 3/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/6/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 9 Stipulation filed by Fair Housing of Marin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/10. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 6 Stipulation filed by Fair Housing of Marin. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair Housing of Marin v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing of Marin
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Paul Jurdo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?