Kwong v. City and County of San Francisco Department of Public Works
Plaintiff: Yim Bing Kwong
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco Department of Public Works
Case Number: 3:2010cv04860
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/5/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER CONTINUING Settlement Conference to 3/1/2012 11:00 AM before Judge Nandor Vadas in Courtroom E , 15th Floor, San Francisco re 34 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/20/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for the limited purpose of representing litigant in the course of settlement conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Letter filed by City and County of San Francisco Department of Public Works. Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas vacating scheduling conference. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT to Federal Pro Bono Project. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Continue 18 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 6 MOTION to Continue filed by Yim Bing Kwong, 7 Order on Motion to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/2/11. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwong v. City and County of San Francisco Department of Public Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yim Bing Kwong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco Department of Public Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?