Vistan Corporation v. Fadei USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vistan Corporation
Defendant: Fadei USA, Inc., Pan American Engineering and Equipment Co., Inc., Fadei S.A., Manuel Silva and Mariani Packing Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv04862
Filed: October 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER, GRANTING re 183 Proposed Order, filed by Manuel Silva, Mariani Packing Co., Inc., Fadei USA, Inc., Fadei S.A., Pan American Engineering and Equipment Co., Inc., for Michael J. Thomas to appear by phone on 8/29/14 at 2:00 PM for the further case management conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/25/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING re 175 Proposed Order filed by Manuel Silva, Mariani Packing Co., Inc., Fadei USA, Inc., Fadei S.A., Pan American Engineering and Equipment Co., Inc., for Michael Thomas to appear by phone on 6/20/14 at 2:00 PM. Counsel shall be on phone standby beginning at 2:00 PM and await the Court's call. Signed, as modifed, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/17/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 146 Motion for Attorney's Fees and vacating hearing (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 127 Motion for Leave (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER FOR BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Motions due by 7/12/2013. Responses/Oppositions due by 8/2/2013. Replies due by 8/16/2013. Motion hearing date 9/13/13 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/11/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER for Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 28, 2012. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 105 Motion for Leave to File.(jsclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 78 Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 56(d).(jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Re Briefing Schedule and Motion Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 56(d). Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 27, 2012. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Claim Construction Order. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on April 27, 2012. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING re 49 Stipulation re Extrinsic Evidence at Claim Construction Hearing filed by Manuel Silva, Mariani Packing Co., Inc., Fadei USA, Inc., Pan American Engineering and Equipment Co., Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/25/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Denying 13 Motion to Strike ; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 13 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADJUSTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE/GRANTING 23 Stipulation For Adjustment to Briefing Schedule filed by Vistan Corporation. Reply due by 3/2/2011. Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismisss Hearing prev. set for 3/25/11 at 1:30 PM, has been re-set for 4/1/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/19/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vistan Corporation v. Fadei USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vistan Corporation
Represented By: Michael Neil Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fadei USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan American Engineering and Equipment Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fadei S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariani Packing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?