ATS Products, Inc. v. Ghiorso et al
Plaintiff: ATS Products, Inc.
Defendant: Frank Ghiorso, Thermalguard Technology, LLC and Thermalguard, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv04880
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 302 Plaintiff's Motion for an Assignment Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RE-TAX COSTS by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 289 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 208 Motion for Protective Order (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman finding as moot 280 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part 281 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/19/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 237 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/13/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 249 HEARING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/12/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER RE FURTHER FILINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/1/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/28/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/15/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 180 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/17/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Continuing Trial. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting re 170 Application of Attorney Larry George to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/28/2011: # 1 Proof of Service) (bzsec, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 FIRST PRETRIAL ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman deferring ruling on re 132 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on re 133 Motion in Limine; granting re 138 Ex-Parte Application. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT REFERRAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/12/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SECOND TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/17/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff & All Counter-Defendants' REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/15/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting re 111 Requset for Court Call Appearance for Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/7/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER STAYING LITIGATION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/9/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 84 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/9/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Scheduling Discovery Conference Telephonic Discovery Hearing re 95 set for 5/9/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Defendants' Response due by noon on 5/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/6/2011. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting re 78 Request for Court Call Appearance. Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/7/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 55 Motion to Shorten Time (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 56 Motion to Shorten Time (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting re 40 Request to Appear by Telephone. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 38 Ex Parte Application to appear telephonically at status conference. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER for Standard Litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/14/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting re 27 Request for Court Call Appearance for Case Management Conference. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR COURTCALL APPEARANCE AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/4/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERS FOLLOWING DECEMBER 6, 2010 HEARING:Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 4 Ex Parte Application (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATS Products, Inc. v. Ghiorso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATS Products, Inc.
Represented By: Marc L. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Ghiorso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermalguard Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermalguard, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?