Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Defendant: Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2010cv04892
Filed: October 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/4/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT REPORT SEEKING CLARIFICATION CONCERNING SCOPE OF COURTS SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/30/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SET DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT REPORT SEEKING CLARIFICATION CONCERNING SCOPE OF COURT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/15/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENT TERMINATING THIS ACTION OR FILE A JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE A PROPOSED JUDGMENT TERMINATING THIS ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO FILE A PROPOSED JUDGMENT TERMINATING THE ACTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/26/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 69 TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE FOR PARTIES' RENEWED CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE 61 DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING REVISED VAUGHN INDEX, ADDITIONAL REVIEW OF DOCUMENTS, AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/30/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 49 FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S REPLY BRIEF BY ONE DAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/26/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 45 TO CONTINUE ALL REMAINING DATES IN BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PARTIES' CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY TWO WEEKS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/10/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 33 TO CONTINUE ALL DATES FOR PARTIES' CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE 31 SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied without prejudice. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2011 10:00 AM to be held telephonically. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 to alter deadline for submitting joint report and allow government counsel to appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: FURTHER MEET & CONFER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/17/11.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 17 TO ALTER BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE: 14 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/5/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 6 Attorney David Sobel's Motion for admission to appear Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Lynch
Represented By: David L. Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Nicholas Patrick Cartier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?