Levi Strauss & Co et al v. Papikian Engerprises, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co and Levi Strauss & Co Europe Comm VA/SCA
Defendant: Galoust Papikian and Papikian Enterprises, Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv05051
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED: 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 141 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 140 Transcript,,, 135 Order LEVI STRAUSS & CO.'S SECOND MOTION FOR ORDER FINDING GALOUST PAPIKIAN IN CONTEMPT AND TO AMEND THE FINAL JUDGMENT filed by Levi Strauss & Co.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING 136 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Directing Counsel to Serve Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 01/17/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 112 MOTION to Alter Judgment; AND SETTING A STATUS CONFERENCE. Joint Status Report due: 1/4/2013. Status Conference set for 1/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING as to 112 MOTION to Alter Judgment AND REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/18/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING 115 MOTION and GRANTING IN PART 113 Ex Parte Application re Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 20, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White RE 91 and 102 Finding Defendant in Contempt and Imposing Sanctions and Attorneys' Fees. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS RE ORDER TO COUNSEL TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND CLARIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/6/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER TO COUNSEL TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/8/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DENYNG AS MOOT 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Responses due by 7/6/2012.Replies due by 7/13/2012. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 22, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING 87 Stipulation to Entry of Judgment and Vacating Trial Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER EXCLUDING Testimony. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 19, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE OVERDUE PAPERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/14/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING 79 STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH, SIXTH AND SEVENTH CLAIMS FOR RELIEF. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/12/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER VACATING Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 26, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
September 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE RE 54 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 6 to Joint Letter Brief. Response due by no later than 9/23/2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 2, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 46 Stipulation for Continuance of Mediation Completion Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 13, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND RULING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation Continuing Mediation Completion Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/17/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 3/18/2011. Replies due by 3/25/2011. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levi Strauss & Co et al v. Papikian Engerprises, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galoust Papikian
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papikian Enterprises, Inc
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Krongold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co
Represented By: Gregory S. Gilchrist
Represented By: Gia L. Cincone
Represented By: Timothy R. Cahn
Represented By: Ryan T. Bricker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co Europe Comm VA/SCA
Represented By: Ryan T. Bricker
Represented By: Timothy R. Cahn
Represented By: Gia L. Cincone
Represented By: Gregory S. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?