J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Concepcion et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Victoria Estrella Concepcion and William Henry Concepcion
Case Number: 3:2010cv05092
Filed: November 10, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup granting 22 Motion for Default Judgment.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO PREPARE FINAL TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 23, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, Motions terminated: 30 Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing the motion hearing on Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment hearing by the Court; and Order (Proposed) filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR ATTORNEY RILEY TO APPEAR AT MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup denying 23 Ex Parte Application (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 17 Ex Parte Application for an Order Vacating the Case Management Conference; and Order (Proposed) filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc.]. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/3/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR ATTORNEY RILEY TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 28, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Concepcion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Estrella Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Henry Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?