G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Meckes et al
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Robert P. Meckes and Darlene Janice Meckes
Case Number: 3:2010cv05124
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 42 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING 40 Request for Judicial Notice OF SETTLEMENT. Status Report due by 9/28/2012. Status Conference set for 10/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/9/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 36 Stipulation Postponing Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation Postponing Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 18 Stipulation POSTPONING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Meckes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Meckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Janice Meckes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?