Cohen et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robyn Cohen, Shannon Stoller, Christopher Marshall, Bryan Siglock and Debra Lewin
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv05282
Filed: November 22, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/3/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF BILLING RECORDS AND TAKING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/27/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MDL ORDER denying transfer, MDL No. 2288. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 57 Stipulation, filed by Debra Lewin, Bryan Siglock, Shannon Stoller, Robyn Cohen, Christopher Marshall (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 51 BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE. Motion for Protective Hearing set for 9/1/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Motion to Dismiss set for 9/15/2011 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/11/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: 8 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen et al v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Cohen
Represented By: Eric Bennett Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Stoller
Represented By: Eric Bennett Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Marshall
Represented By: Eric Bennett Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Siglock
Represented By: Eric Bennett Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lewin
Represented By: Eric Bennett Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?