Skaff v. Blake's Restaurant Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Richard Skaff
Defendant: IJ Marketplace, LLC, Rielly Marketplace, LLC, Fair Oaks Marketplace, LLC, Roseville Marketplace, LLC and Blake's Restaurant Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv05296
Filed: November 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF IJ MARKETPLACE, LLC, RIELLY MARKETPLACE, LLC, FAIR OAKS MARKETPLACE, LLC, AND ROSEVILLE MARKETPLACE, LLC filed by Richard Skaff. Rielly Marketplace, LLC, Roseville Marketplace, LLC, Fair Oaks Marketplace, LLC and IJ Marketplace, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/2/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF THE DAMAGES AND ATTORNEY'S FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND COSTS ASPECTS OF THE LAWSUIT AGAINST BLAKE'S RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, dba BRICK & BOTTLE ONLY filed by Richard Skaff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/28/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF THE INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ASPECT OF THE LAWSUIT AGAINST BLAKE'S RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC, dba BRICK AND BOTTLE ONLY filed by Richard Skaff.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/2/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER enlarging time to meet and confer regarding settlement re 13 Stipulation filed by Blake's Restaurant Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/25/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skaff v. Blake's Restaurant Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IJ Marketplace, LLC
Represented By: Martin H. Orlick
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rielly Marketplace, LLC
Represented By: Martin H. Orlick
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kenefick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fair Oaks Marketplace, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kenefick
Represented By: Martin H. Orlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseville Marketplace, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Kenefick
Represented By: Martin H. Orlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake's Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Skaff
Represented By: Sidney J. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?