Muegge v. Hyatt Vineyard Creek et al
Plaintiff: Edward Muegge
Defendant: Hyatt Vineyard Creek, Noble A.E.W. Vineyard Creek, LLC, City of Santa Rosa and Brasserie Restaurant
Case Number: 3:2010cv05403
Filed: November 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING 39 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendants Noble A.E.W. Vineyard Creek, LLC, dba Hyatt Vineyard Creek, Brasserie Restaurant and City of Santa Rosa. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 REQUEST TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE:Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2013. Status Conference set for 2/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/10/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 34 STIPULATION Continuing General Order 56 Mediation Deadline. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/16/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 2/24/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, Attorney Minh N. Vu for City of Santa Rosa added. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/3/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muegge v. Hyatt Vineyard Creek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Muegge
Represented By: Timothy Squire Thimesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Vineyard Creek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble A.E.W. Vineyard Creek, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Santa Rosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brasserie Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?