Eastman Kodak Company v. Epson Imaging Devices Corporation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Eastman Kodak Company
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., AU Optronics Corporation and AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv05452
Filed: December 1, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2012 103 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 9, 2012 102 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS re 66 , 72 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 10/10/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2012 101 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (6649) Ex Parte Application for leave to file under seal in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 3, 2012 100 Featured Case ORDER signed by Susan Illston on 10/3/12 granting (6867) Ex Parte Application in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Application to shorten time on Motion #'s 6574 and 6575 to 10/12/12 @ 9 a.m. ; granting (167) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-01115-SI; granting (396) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (216) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-05609-SI; granting (465) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting (287) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (82) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-03205-SI; granting (116) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-04346-SI; granting (281) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; granting (375) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; granting (99) Ex Parte Application in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
October 1, 2012 99 Ex Parte Application For An Order To Shorten Time For Hearing (filed as docket #6867 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 27, 2012 98 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing As To Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras, Master Docket Nos. 6054 & 6145; Docket Nos. 276 & 291 in 09-4997; Docket No. 194 in 10-0117; Docket Nos. 175 & 188 in 10-4572; Docket Nos. 229 & 249 in 10-4945; Docket Nos. 66 & 72 in 10-5452; Docket Nos. 165 & 181 in 11-0058. 2.Motion For Partial Summary Judgment on Motorola's Foreign Contract and Unjust Enrichment Claims, Master Docket No. 6322, and Docket No. 413 in 09-5840. The motions are deemed submitted and the Court shall issue an order shortly.This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.CLERKS NOTICE Taking motions off the 9/28/12 calendar. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 26, 2012 97 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO SPECIAL MASTER'S ORDER STRIKING EXPERT REPORTS 91 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 20, 2012 96 RESPONSE (re 91 MOTION for Discovery - Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Expert Reports (public redacted version) (filed in MDL docket on 9/7, spreading to individual dockets) ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Sur Rebuttal Expert Reports filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Belgum, Karl) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 95 CLERKS NOTICE : The following motions are taken off calendar for September 21, 2012, the motions SHALL BE CONTINUED TO FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2012, AT 9:00 A.M.. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Defendants' MSJ for Lack of Antitrust Standing as to Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras, Master Docket Nos. 6054 & 6145, Dkt. Nos. 276 & 291 in 09-4997; Dkt. No. 194 in 10-0117; Dkt. Nos. 175 & 188 in 10-4582; Dkt. Nos. 229 & 249 in 10-4945; Dkt. Nos. 66 & 72 in 10-5452; and Dkt. Nos. 165 & 181 in 11-0058. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012) Modified on 9/20/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6054 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (6145 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (291 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (276 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (194 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, (249 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (229 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (72 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (66 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (165 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS, (181 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 20, 2012 94 CLERKS NOTICE : The following motions are taken off calendar for September 21, 2012, the motions SHALL BE CONTINUED TO FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 28, 2012, AT 9:00 A.M.. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Defendants' MSJ for Lack of Antitrust Standing as to Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras, Master Docket Nos. 6054 & 6145 , Dkt. Nos. 276 & 291 in 09-4997; Dkt. No. 194 in 10-0117; Dkt. Nos. 175 & 188 in 10-4582; Dkt. Nos. 229 & 249 in 10-4945; Dkt. Nos. 66 & 72 in 10-5452; and Dkt. Nos. 165 & 181 in 11-0058. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012) Modified on 9/20/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6054 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (276 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (175 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (229 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (66 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 12, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6145 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (291 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (194 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, (188 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (249 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (72 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (165 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS, (181 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 12, 2012 93 Featured Case ORDER signed on 9/11/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6670 ) Stipulation continuing motions from 9/14/12 to 9/21/12 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (367) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (266) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (261) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; granting (346) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; granting (92) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI; granting (265) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 10, 2012 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, LTD.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 91 MOTION for Discovery - Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Expert Reports (public redacted version) (filed in MDL docket on 9/7, spreading to individual dockets) filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/14/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11-1, # 13 Exhibit 11-2, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44, # 47 Exhibit 45, # 48 Exhibit 46, # 49 Exhibit 47, # 50 Exhibit 48, # 51 Exhibit 49, # 52 Exhibit 50, # 53 Exhibit 51, # 54 Exhibit 52, # 55 Exhibit 53, # 56 Exhibit 54, # 57 Exhibit 55, # 58 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 10, 2012 90 Ex Parte Application to Submit Documents Under Seal in Support of Objection to Special Master's Order Striking Defendants' Expert Reports (filed in MDL docket on 9/7, spreading to individual dockets) filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Davidson in support of sealing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 4, 2012 89 CLERKS NOTICE The following motions are continued from 9/7/12 to 9/14/12, at 9:00 a.m. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (6145 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (6054 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (291 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (276 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (194 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMER, (188 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (175 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (249 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (229 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (66 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, (72 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (165 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS, (181 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 24, 2012 88 REPLY (re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI ) filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Salezka L. Aguirre, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 20, 2012 CLERK NOTICE: Counsel shall file a letter indicating the docket numbers of all the motions filed in the related cases that are continued to 10/5/12. pursuant to the Courts Order granting Stipulation # 6477 by Thursday, August 23, 2012. THIS IS A DOCKET TEXT ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.Set/Reset Deadlines as to (5869 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing Target Plaintiffs' Claims, (5875 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing AT&T Mobility LLC's Claims, (6234 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Standing Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee, (5979 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment --Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claims Based on Indirect Purchases (Costco), (6359 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Toshiba on Liability Issues Determined in the Toshiba Trial, (260 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing AT&T's Claims. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 87 Order by Hon. Susan Illston granting (6472) Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Motions in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. Associated Cases: 3:07-md-01827-SI, 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:09-cv-05609-SI, 3:10-cv-00117-SI, 3:10-cv-01064-SI, 3:10-cv-04945-SI, 3:10-cv-05452-SI, 3:11-cv-00058-SI(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 16, 2012 86 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Toshba Entities for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee with Respect to Eastman Kodak Company (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Selection set for 6/24/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 6/24/2013 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2013 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
August 9, 2012 85 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/3/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 8/9/2012). The Court vacated the November trial date as to Track One.NEW TRIAL SCHEDULE:The track one plaintiffs will be split into two groups for purposes of pretrial and trial dates: Group one: ATS Claim, LLC (09-1115); Nokia (09-5609); Dell, Inc. (10-1064)Group one pretrial date: January 15, 2013Group one trial date: January 22, 2013Group two: Best Buy Co., Inc. (10-4572); Target Corp. (10-4945); and Eastman Kodak Co. (10-5452)Group two pretrial date: June 11, 2013Group two trial date: June 24, 2013Because AT&T has an appeal pending in the 9th Circuit which could ultimately impact the legal contours of its case, the Court will wait for the appeal to be resolved before scheduling a trial.The remaining cases -- Motorola Mobility, Inc. (09-5840) (N.D. Ill.); Electrograph Systems, Inc. (10-0117) (E.D.N.Y.); and Costco (11-0058) (W.D. Wa.) -- were filed out of district and will be transferred back to the originating district so that a court there may establish pretrial/trial dates in accordance with its calendar/procedures. (Court Reporter n/a.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2012)
August 2, 2012 84 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Under Illinois Brick and In Re ATM Fee filed by Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/21/2012. Replies due by 9/28/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John H. Chung, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of John H. Chung, # 13 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 30, 2012 83 Declaration of Lauren E. Wood in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing as to Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A thru P)(Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 82 RESPONSE (re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 81 Declaration of Blaire Z. Russell in Support of 80 Opposition/Response to Motion, for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment for Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing as to Claims Involving Mobile Phones and Digital Still Cameras filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Related document(s) 80 ) (Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 80 RESPONSE (re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI ) Additional Individual Opposition filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 30, 2012 79 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
July 26, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER signed on 7/26/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (6263) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (189) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05609-SI; granting (225) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (277) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-01064-SI; granting (77) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among the undersigned counsel, on behalf of all Track 1 plaintiffs and defendants, as follows: 1. The Track 1 parties will file a Joint Case Management Conference Statement by July 27, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) Modified on 7/30/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2012 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Set/Reset Hearings AMENDED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 24, 2012 76 Notice of Withdrawal of 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's California and Nevada Claims (Dkt 6260 in MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/24/2012) Modified on 7/25/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2012 75 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 6217 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (74) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI regarding Plaintiff Eastman Kodak Co. State Law Claims (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 18, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 18, 2012 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Kodak's State Law Claims filed by Eastman Kodak Company. (Belgum, Karl) (Filed on 7/18/2012)
July 17, 2012 73 Featured Case ORDER: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/16/12., Motions terminated: (148 in 3:09-cv-01115-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, (383 in 3:09-cv-05840-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (198 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, (187 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, (257 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (248 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (290 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, Au Optronics Corporation America, Inc, (71 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (177 in 3:09-cv-05609-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (180 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, ( 6144 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) Modified on 7/18/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 72 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 70 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 8-10, # 3 Exhibit 12-13, # 4 Exhibit 15-19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21-25, # 7 Exhibit 26-28, # 8 Exhibit 30-36)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/12/2012) Modified on 7/13/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2012 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 70 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( 6053 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, (65 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (275 in 3:09-cv-04997-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, Au Optronics Corporation America, Inc, (164 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, (174 in 3:10-cv-04572-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America, (228 in 3:10-cv-04945-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/11/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 69 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 10, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing : TRIAL SET FOR TRACK ONE CASES. Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2012 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
July 2, 2012 68 Proposed Order re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, 65 Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, 67 Declaration in Support,,, by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 67 Declaration of SALEZKA L. AGUIRRE in Support of 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STI, 65 Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBITS 1-6 FILED UNDER SEAL, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBITS 8-10 FILED UNDER SEAL, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBITS 12-13FILED UNDER SEAL, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBITS 15-28 FILED UNDER SEAL, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 29, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBITS 30-36 FILED UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) 66 , 65 ) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF ANTITRUST INJURY AND LACK OF ANTITRUST STANDING AS TO CLAIMS INVOLVING MOBILE PHONES AND DIGITAL STILL CAMERAS filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/30/2012. Replies due by 8/24/2012. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 65 Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 26, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 64 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 26, 2012 64 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 63 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Defendants' joint motion for partial summary judgment on plaintiff's California and Nevada claims by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 E-Filed Unde Seal)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/26/2012) Modified on 6/27/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2012 63 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( 5984 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, (59 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 22, 2012 62 Proposed Order re 59 Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CALIFORNIA AND NEVADA CLAIMS, 61 Declaration in Support,, [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS JOINT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CALIFORNIA AND NEVADA CLAIMS by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 61 Declaration of SALEZKA L. AGUIRRE in Support of 59 Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CALIFORNIA AND NEVADA CLAIMS filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 - UNDER SEAL, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2)(Related document(s) 59 , 60 ) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 60 MOTION for Summary Judgment [REDACTED VERSION] DEFENDANTS JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS CALIFORNIA AND NEVADA CLAIMS filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 7/20/2012. Replies due by 8/17/2012. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 22, 2012 59 Ex Parte Application AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration TO FILE UNDER SEAL, # 2 Proposed Order GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
May 15, 2012 58 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5617 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( 253 ) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (333) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting ( 173 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting ( 224 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-01064-SI; granting ( 160 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04572-SI; granting ( 199 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04945-SI; granting ( 56 ) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05452-SI; granting in part and denying in part ( 149 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI.NOW, THEREFORE, Plaintiffs and AUO, through their undersigned liaison counsel and counsel, stipulate as follows: 1. The deadline for the expert report of Dr. Guthrie is extended from April 30, 2012 to May 4, 2012. Dr. Guthries report was served on May 4, 2012. The deadline for the expert reports of Mr. Deal and Dr. Hall is extended from April 30, 2012 to May 7, 2012. 2. The deadlines for the depositions of Mr. Deal, Dr. Guthrie, and Dr. Hall shall be taken 45 days from the service of the reports. 3. Plaintiffs rebuttal expert report, as described in the November 22, 2011 Stipulated Order, is now due on July 9, 2012. The deposition of Plaintiffs rebuttal expert will be taken within twenty-one (21) days of the service of Plaintiffs rebuttal expert report. 4. With regard to the reports and depositions anticipated by Paragraphs 1, 2 and 3, the parties will meet and confer in good faith in an effort to expedite the process, including consideration of whether certain reports or depositions can be eliminated. All parties will cooperate informally in providing information about the underlying data and analyses used in the reports. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 10, 2012 57 ASSOCIATION of Counsel (MARTHA BOERSCH) by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 8, 2012 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING AUO EXPERT WITNESSES ** CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 55 ** filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 7, 2012 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING AUO PROPOSED EXPERT WITNESSES filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
March 23, 2012 54 NOTICE by Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. / Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and of Issue and Claim Preclusion (Curran, Christopher) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 5, 2012 53 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 1, 2012 52 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of DEFENDANTS DESCRIPTIONS OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
March 1, 2012 51 NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Company of Description of Issues and Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
December 27, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER Re: Extension of time to respond to Contention Discovery Requests (#4400) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 16, 2011 49 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 15, 2011 48 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING 30(B)(6) DEPOS. BEYOND CUTOFF re 46 . (#4312) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011) Modified on 12/16/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING TIME TO RESPOND TO CONTENTION DISCOVERY REQUESTS (#4313) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 8, 2011 46 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Permitting 30(b)(6) Deposition of Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. Beyond Discovery Cut-Off Date by Eastman Kodak Company. (Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 45 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
November 23, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER Re: AUO Depositions (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 18, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER TO MODIFY NOVEMBER 13, 2009 ORDER RE DEPONENTS ASSERTING THE FIFTH AMENDMENT PRIVILEGE AGAINST SELF-INCRIMINATION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 7, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AS TO THE AUTHENTICITY OF DOCUMENTS AND THEIR STATUS AS "BUSINESS RECORDS" (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
September 23, 2011 41 DEFENDANT AU OPTRONICS CORPORATIONS AND AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICAS ANSWER to Complaint of Eastman Kodak Company byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 40 ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended) byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 39 Answer to Amended Complaint / Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s Answer to Eastman Kodak Company's First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Electronics Components, Inc.. (Chung, John) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 38 Answer to Amended Complaint / Toshiba Mobile Display Co. Ltd.'s Answer to Eastman Kodak Company's First Amended Complaint byToshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Chung, John) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 37 Answer to Amended Complaint / Toshiba Corporation's Answer to Eastman Kodak Company's First Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (Chung, John) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 15, 2011 36 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 8, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND (EASTMAN) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 6, 2011 34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Richard, Patrick) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 24, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 23, 2011 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS KODAK'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 25 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) Modified on 8/24/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2011 31 REPLY (re 25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint of Eastman Kodak Company ) filed byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 10, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER re Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint of Eastman Kodak Company AND PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENT NUNC PRO TUNC by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2011) Modified on 8/11/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2011 29 STIPULATION re 25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint of Eastman Kodak Company AND PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE DOCUMENT NUNC PRO TUNC by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 5, 2011 28 RESPONSE/Opposition to (re 25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint of Eastman Kodak Company ) filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Foote, John) (Filed on 8/5/2011) Modified on 8/5/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2011 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaire Zina Russell (Russell, Blaire) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 22, 2011 26 Proposed Order re 25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint of Eastman Kodak Company by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 25 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint of Eastman Kodak Company filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/5/2011. Replies due by 8/12/2011. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 14, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2012 03:30 PM before Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
June 22, 2011 23 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 22 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal AMENDED COMPLAINT by Eastman Kodak Company. (Belgum, Karl) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 16, 2011 21 AFFIDAVIT /DECLARATION OF CARL L. BLUMENSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 14, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Joint Motion to dismiss 12 Hearing date set for 7/15/11 is terminated. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011) Modified on 6/16/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 9, 2011 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eastman Kodak Company re 19 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal (Belgum, Karl) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 9, 2011 19 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Belgum, Karl) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 7, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER re: 15 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Extending Time to File First Amended Complaint and Response Thereto by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company. (Foote, John) (Filed on 5/24/2011) (Entered: 05/24/2011 (hearing set 7/8/11) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2011 17 Featured Case ORDER STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2011) (Entered: 05/25/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 16 YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT ALL motions previously noticed for June 17, 2011, have been continued to July 15, 2011, at 9:00 a.m.Also, motion #2739 in 07-1827 is a motion to dismiss filed by Hannstar. It should have also been filed under 10-4572 SI.Set/Reset Deadlines as to (12 in 3:10-cv-05452-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint, (2708 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss --Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss State of Oregon First Amended Complaint, (2743 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, (2739 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Complaint, (2754 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint; Proposed Order., CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. Transcript Restriction Date terminated re 8 Transcript, 9 Transcript,. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 15 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Hearing on Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Extending Time to File First Amended Complaint and Response Thereto by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Eastman Kodak Company. (Foote, John) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 14 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 12, 2011 13 Proposed Order re 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 11, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (42 in 3:10-cv-01064-SI) Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support ThereofJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) and Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Thereof, (2648 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) re Court's March 16, 2011 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Dell Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points & AuJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) re Court's March 16, 2011 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Dell Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points & AuJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) re Court's March 16, 2011 Order Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Dell Plaintiffs' Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Au, (2649 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) re Court's March 28, 2011 Order Denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Motorola Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support ThereoJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) re Court's March 28, 2011 Order Denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Motorola Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support ThereoJoint MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) re Court's March 28, 2011 Order Denying Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Motorola Complaint; Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Thereo. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 2, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER granting extenstion of time to respond to complaint (Eastman Kodak) re 10 Stipulation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 10 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDIING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
February 17, 2011 9 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 4, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 15, 2011 8 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. *** Transcript of Proceedings held on February 4, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/16/2011. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 2/15/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER extending deadline to respond to complaint re 6 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011) Modified on 2/9/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 6 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, WAIVER OF SERVICE, PRODUCTION OF DATA, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
December 17, 2010 5 Summons Issued as to AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd.. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 4 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File documents #1, #2, #3 by plaintiff's counsels. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 1, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 3 Disclosure Statement by Eastman Kodak Company identifying Other Affiliate Legg Mason Capital Management, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Fund Holdings, L.P. for Eastman Kodak Company. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010) (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2010 2 NOTICE of Related Case to 07-md-1827 by Eastman Kodak Company (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010) (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2010 1 COMPLAINT (No Process) against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611053433.). Filed byEastman Kodak Company. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010) (ys, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ys, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastman Kodak Company v. Epson Imaging Devices Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastman Kodak Company
Represented By: Karl David Belgum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?