County of Alameda-v-AMBAC Financial Group Inc.
Plaintiff: The Redevelopment Agency of The City of Stockton, The Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton, County of Tulare, The Regents of the University of California, The Redevelopment Agency of San Jose, County of Alameda, City and County of San Francisco, City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department of Water and Power, The Los Angeles World Airports, City Of Oakland, City of Richmond, Redwood City, East Bay Municipal Utility District, City of Sacramento, Sacramento Suburban Water District, Sacramento Municipal Utility District, City of San Jose and City of Stockton
Defendant: Ambac Financial Group, Inc., Ambac Assurance Corporation, MBIA, Inc., MBIA Insurance Corporation, MBIA Insurance Corp. of Illinois, Syncora Guarantee, Inc., Financial Guaranty Insurance Company, Financial Security Assurance, Inc., CIFG Assurance North America, Inc., Assured Guaranty Corp. and Jason Kissane
Case Number: 3:2010cv05572
Filed: December 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 Stipulation to Remand. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/4/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 8 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE TO C-10-5318 JSW. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Alameda-v-AMBAC Financial Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ambac Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ambac Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Ella Campi
Represented By: John Paul Girarde
Represented By: Brian N. Lasky
Represented By: Robert P. LoBue
Represented By: James Anthony Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBIA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBIA Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBIA Insurance Corp. of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syncora Guarantee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Guaranty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Security Assurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIFG Assurance North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assured Guaranty Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Kissane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Redevelopment Agency of The City of Stockton
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Public Financing Authority of the City of Stockton
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Tulare
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Redevelopment Agency of San Jose
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Alameda
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles Department of Water and Power
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Los Angeles World Airports
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Of Oakland
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Richmond
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redwood City
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Municipal Utility District
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacramento Suburban Water District
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacramento Municipal Utility District
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of San Jose
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Stockton
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Nanci Eiko Nishimura
Represented By: Louise Hornbeck Renne
Represented By: Daniel Robert Sterrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?