EIT Holdings LLC v. Yelp!, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: EIT Holdings LLC
Defendant: Yelp!, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C., Netflix, Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Classmates Online, Inc., eHarmony.Com, Inc. and Monster Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv05623
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE by EIT Holdings LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Dergosits, Michael) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by EIT Holdings LLC re 6 Notice (Other) (Good, Mark) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE by EIT Holdings LLC Notice of Association of Counsel (Good, Mark) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 21, 2010 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 1/4/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 13, 2010 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Classmates Online, Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Monster Worldwide, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C., Yelp!, Inc., eHarmony.Com, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Classmates Online, Inc., Linkedin Corporation, Monster Worldwide, Inc., Netflix, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C., Yelp!, Inc., eHarmony.Com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611053844). Filed by EIT Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
December 10, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EIT Holdings LLC v. Yelp!, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EIT Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Dergosits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp!, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classmates Online, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eHarmony.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Worldwide, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?