Actuate Corporation v. Aon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Actuate Corporation
Defendant: Aon Corporation and The Warranty Group Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv05750
Filed: December 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 186 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PLAINTIFF ACTUATE CORPORATION AND DEFENDANT TWG WARRANTY GROUP, INC.S STIPULATION TO DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by Actuate Corporation, 187 STIPULATION WIT H PROPOSED ORDER PLAINTIFF ACTUATE CORPORATION AND DEFENDANT TWG WARRANTY GROUP, INC.S STIPULATION TO DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ACTUATE CORPORATIONS APPEAL OF THE COURTS RULING ON TWGS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS filed by Actuate Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER RE STIPULATED EXTENSION re 181 Notice (Other) filed by Actuate Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS re 175 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 21, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 6, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 OMNIBUS ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 18, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE REGARDING EXPERT TESTIMONY. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 13, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE RE CHANGE OF TIME OF FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO LIMIT MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 12, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 1, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TENTATIVE ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 30, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (7/9/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (6/18/2012). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING UNTIMELY MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER AND NEW COUNTERCLAIMS AND VACATING HEARING re 30 MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Answer to Complaint (Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Comp laint, and Counterclaims) MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Answer to Complaint (Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint, and Counterclaims) MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Answer to Complaint (Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint, and Counterclaims) filed by Aon Corporation. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 17, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Actuate Corporation v. Aon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Naranjo
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Represented By: Patrick T. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Warranty Group Inc
Represented By: Michael A. Naranjo
Represented By: Eileen Regina Ridley
Represented By: Patrick T. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Actuate Corporation
Represented By: Robert D Tadlock
Represented By: James G. Gilliland
Represented By: Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?