Long v. Ingenio Inc
Plaintiff: James Thomas Long
Defendant: Ingenio Inc
Case Number: 3:2010cv05761
Filed: December 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/11/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Replies due by 4/16/2015. Responses due by 3/26/2015. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Replies due by 4/9/2015. Responses due by 3/19/2015. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/3/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/11/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE POST-REMAND PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 22 BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT IGENIO, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Ingenio Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas Long
Represented By: Nancy Hersh
Represented By: Charles Carroll Kelly, II
Represented By: Sheri L. Kelly
Represented By: Daniel Timothy LeBel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingenio Inc
Represented By: James F. Bogan, III
Represented By: Mehrnaz Boroumand Smith
Represented By: C. Allen Garrett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?