Mendoza v. Wilmington Finance et al
Plaintiff: Catarino Mendoza
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Vericrest Financial, Five Star Investment and Realty, Wilmington Finance, New Century and North American Title Company
Case Number: 3:2010cv05792
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/29/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/28/2011.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/18/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 22 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants Vericrest and MERS time to respond to Plaintiff's first amended complaint to 7/1/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Vericrest Financial time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 6/1/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants Vericrest Financial and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to 5/2/11. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/29/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE OF DEFENDANTS VERICREST FINANCIAL AND MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/16/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADINE FOR DFT AIG FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, FKA, WILMINGTON FINANCE, A DIVISION OF AIG FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/4/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. Wilmington Finance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Lee Compere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vericrest Financial
Represented By: Eric Lee Compere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Star Investment and Realty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Finance
Represented By: Maralee MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catarino Mendoza
Represented By: Joseph Antonio Lepera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?