New Sensations, Inc v. Does 1-1745
Plaintiff: New Sensations, Inc
Defendant: John Doe 173.76.128.164, Ronald Burr, Jr., John Doe 113, N-I-Tech, LLC, John Doe #895, Daniel Kane, Doe 733 and Does 1-1745
Case Number: 3:2010cv05863
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT , Namely That with the Filing of Documents 57, 62 and 63, All Defendants Have Been Dismissed From the Case, Some Without Prejudice and Some With Prejudice, and No Defendants Remain in the Case by New Sensations, Inc. (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 63 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) Dismissal Without Prejudice of Specific Doe Defendants, Namely Does 2-6, 8, 10-16, 18-59, 61-82, 84-87, 89-92, 94-98, 100-103, 106-109, 111-113, 115, 117-138, 140-156, 158-203, 205-220, 222-227, 229-253, 255-282, 284-307, 311-313, 315-366, 368-414, 416-418, 420-461, 463-472, 474-558, 561-564, 566-568, 570, 604-619, 621-623, 625-719, 721-726, 728, 731-791, 793-855, 857-859, 861-864, 866-871, 873-885, 888, 890-907, 909-944, 946-949, 952-989, 991-992, 994, 996-1019, 1070-1090, 1092-1102, 1104-1143, 1145-1166, 1168-1176, 1178-1435, 1438-1440, 1443-45, 1447-1460, 1462-1479, 1481-1483, 1485-1502, 1505, 1507-1508, 1511, 1513, and 1515-1745 by New Sensations, Inc (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) Dismissal With Prejudice of Specific Doe Defendant(s), Namely Doe(s) 1, 88, 93, 104, 105, 110, 139,254, 308, 310, 314, 367, 462, 569, 571, 572,624, 720, 727, 729, 730, 856, 860, 889, 951,1020, 1021, 1091, 1167, 1461, 1462, 1503,1506, 1509, 1512 by New Sensations, Inc (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 61 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motions to Dismiss, Motion to Quash, and General Defenses, filed by Daniel Kane. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2011: #1 Envelope) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Responses due by 9/20/2011. Replies due by 9/27/2011. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re #58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by John Doe 113. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 7, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2011 Filing 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal a Portion of a Document, filed by John Doe 113. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of Does 7, 9, 17, 60, 83, 99, 114, 116, 157, 204, 221, 228, 283, 309, 415, 419, 473, 559, 560, 565, 603, 620, 792, 865, 872, 886, 887, 908, 945, 950, 990, 993, 995, 1069, 1103, 1144, 1177, 1436, 1437, 1441, 1442, 1446, 1480, 1484, 1504, 1510, and 1514 Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 41(a) by New Sensations, Inc (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER STRIKING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS, DISMISS ACTION, AND VACATE PREVIOUS ORDERS, Order by Hon. William Alsup striking #55 Motion to Quash.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Filing 55 *** STRICKEN PER DKT. NO. #56 . *** MOTION to Quash filed by John Doe 173.76.128.164. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 8/30/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sweet, Jason) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/17/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER STRIKING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA OR DISMISS COMPLAINT, Order by Hon. William Alsup striking #52 Motion to Quash.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY SWEET PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup finding as moot #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Filing 52 *** STRICKEN PER DKT. NO. #54 . *** MOTION to Quash filed by John Doe 173.76.128.164. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Responses due by 8/30/2011. Replies due by 9/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sweet, Jason) (Filed on 8/16/2011) Modified on 8/16/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Filing 51 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275.) filed by John Doe 173.76.128.164. (Sweet, Jason) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 12, 2011 Filing 50 Letter from "Anonymous" dated August 3, 2011. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 12, 2011 Filing 49 Letter from Emmanuel Antoine dated August 2, 2011. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 48 Letter from Blake G. regarding subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING MOTION BY N-I-TECH TO QUASH SUBPOENA, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying #36 Motion to Quash.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2011 Filing 47 Letter from Emmanuel Antoine regarding subpoena. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court expects all Doe defendants to be identified and served by October 6, 2011. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/4/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2011 Filing 45 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/4/2011 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/4/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 2:00 PM. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 43 RESPONSE (re #36 MOTION to Quash ) Plaintiff's Opposition to N-I-Tech's Motion to Quash filed byNew Sensations, Inc. (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Order by Hon. William Alsup denying #41 Ex Parte Application.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 Filing 41 Ex Parte Application re #29 Clerks Notice, PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ORDER VACATING THE ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE, AND PLAINTIFF'S STATUS REPORT filed by New Sensations, Inc. (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER STRIKING MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO VERIZON, Order by Hon. William Alsup striking #39 Motion to Quash.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2011 Filing 39 *** STRICKEN PER DKT. NO. #40 . *** MOTION to Quash and/or Vacate Subpoena and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, filed by John Doe #895. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) Modified on 7/26/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/26/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #38 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion to Quash,. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO QUASH SUBPOENA, DISMISS COMPLAINT, REMOVE ACTION, AND SEVER CLAIMS, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying #21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying #22 Motion to Quash (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (fj, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO QUASH re #36 MOTION to Quash filed by N-I-Tech, LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 13, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2011 Filing 36 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by N-I-Tech, LLC. Responses due by 7/26/2011. Replies due by 8/2/2011. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REGARDING PRECIS REQUESTS re #33 Notice (Other) filed by Doe 733. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 8, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (fj, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2011 Filing 34 RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #22 MOTION to Quash ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Burr's Motion filed byNew Sensations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Siegel Declaration in Connection with Plaintiff's Opposition to Burr's Motions)(Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 6, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE by Doe 733 OF PRECIS RE: REQUEST TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY AND TO FILE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA / MOTION TO DISMISS (Eassa, Robert) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Jason Sweet ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611061787) filed by John Doe 173.76.128.164. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REGARDING MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 24, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #29 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge Wiliam Alsup on 11/20/08. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 29 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/28/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/4/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER STRIKING ANONYMOUS MOTION TO DISMISS re #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2), or in the Alternative, to Drop Doe #733 Pursuant to FRCP 21, And to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena filed by Doe 733, #25 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Doe 733. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 23, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CIFELLI PRO HAC VICE by Judge Alsup finding as moot #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2011 Filing 26 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Cifelli ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611061090.) filed by Doe 733. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Eassa, Robert) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 25 *** STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT. SEE DKT. NO. #28 . *** Renotice motion hearing re #13 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2), or in the Alternative, to Drop Doe #733 Pursuant to FRCP 21, And to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena filed by Doe 733. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Eassa, Robert) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING ON BURR MOTIONS re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Burr, Jr., #22 MOTION to Quash filed by Ronald Burr, Jr.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 22, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 22, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2011: #1 Certificate of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT in Support and General Defenses, re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #22 MOTION to Quash filed by Ronald Burr, Jr. (Related document(s) #21 , #22 ) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION to Quash and/or Vacate Subpoena and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ronald Burr, Jr. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ronald Burr, Jr. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Ronald Burr, Jr. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/17/11. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE by Doe 733 re #15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611061090.) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 16 Declaration of Robert D. Eassa in Support of #15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611061090.) filed byDoe 733. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Michael A. Cifelli leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611061090.) filed by Doe 733. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 13 *** STRICKEN BY ORDER OF COURT. SEE DKT. NO. #28 . *** MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2), or in the Alternative, to Drop Doe #733 Pursuant to FRCP 21, And to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena filed by Doe 733. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Responses due by 6/29/2011. Replies due by 7/6/2011. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Eassa, Robert) (Filed on 6/15/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/23/2011 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH re #11 Proposed Order filed by Does 1-1745. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/19/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 18, 2011 Filing 11 Proposed Order: Motion to Quash re #1 Complaint, by Doe. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Status Report due by 9/22/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/26/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by New Sensations, Inc. (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting #7 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Discovery (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to a Rule 26 Conference filed by New Sensations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nicolini Declaration re Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to a Rule 26 Conference, #2 Affidavit Siegel Declaration re Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to a Rule 26 Conference, #3 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to a Rule 26 Conference)(Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 4/28/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/8/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
January 25, 2011 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by New Sensations, Inc.. (Siegel, Ira) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 23, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/23/10. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by New Sensations, Inc re #1 Complaint, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /no process against Does 1-1745 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611054257.). Filed byNew Sensations, Inc. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2010: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2) (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Sensations, Inc v. Does 1-1745
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 173.76.128.164
Represented By: Jason E Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Burr, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 113
Represented By: Jason E Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N-I-Tech, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #895
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 733
Represented By: Robert D. Eassa
Represented By: Michael A. Cifelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-1745
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Sensations, Inc
Represented By: Ira M. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?