Corral v. Federal Express Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Charles Corral
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation and Glenn Dunlap
Case Number: 3:2010cv05965
Filed: December 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/25/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: SEALED SETTLEMENT TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/24/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Notice re: Settlement Conference Location. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/20/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/24/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re-scheduling pretrial conference to 07/16/12 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. The trial date shall remain as scheduled on 08/07/12. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/09/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corral v. Federal Express Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Craig Edward Lindberg
Represented By: Emily Christin Pera
Represented By: Christopher James Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Corral
Represented By: Shyamala Toke Rajender
Represented By: Waukeen Quandrico McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?